Science Foundation Ireland.
Mr. John Travers and Professor Martina Newell McGloughlin were appointed as members of the Board of Science Foundation Ireland on 25 July 2007. These appointments were published in Irish Oifigiúil on the 14 of September 2007. Professor Rita Colwell and Mr. Tom Boland were appointed as members of the Board of Science Foundation Ireland on 31 of March 2008 and 1 of April 2008 respectively. These appointments will be published in Iris Oifigiúil shortly. There are no current vacancies on the Board of Science Foundation Ireland. It is anticipated that two members of the Board will retire from office on the 25 of July 2008.
IDA Ireland
Mr. Barry O'Leary, CEO, was appointed on 19 December 2007. The notice of his appointment was published in the Iris Oifigiúil on 4 January 2008.
Ms. Loretta Brennan Glucksman was re-appointed on 19 December 2007. The notice of her appointment was published in the Iris Oifigiúil on 4 January 2008.
Mr. Lionel Alexander was appointed on 19 March 2008. The notice of his appointment was sent to Iris Oifigiúil on 27 March 2008 and has yet to be published. This should be published in the near future.
There are currently no vacancies on the Board of IDA Ireland.
Enterprise Ireland
Mr. Liam Meaney, and Mr. Gearoid Doyle were appointed to the Board of Enterprise Ireland on 17 January 2008.
Ms Helen Nugent was appointed to the Board of Enterprise Ireland on 18 March, 2008.
None of the above appointments have yet been published in Iris Oifigiúil. However, they will be published in the near future.
There are no vacancies on the Enterprise Ireland Board at present, however, from July of this year, three members of the Board will retire.
Forfás
Dr. Frank Gannon, Director General, Science Foundation Ireland, was appointed to the board of Forfás on 2 July 2007. The notice of his appointment was published in the Iris Oifigiúil on 20 July 2007.
Mr. Sean Gorman and Mr. Eoin O'Driscoll were re-appointed to the board of Forfás on 1 January 2008.
Mr. Barry O'Leary, Chief Executive Officer, IDA Ireland, was appointed to the board of Forfás on 1 January 2008.
Details of all three appointments were published in Iris Oifigiúil on 18 March 2008.
There are no existing vacancies on the Forfás Board and none are anticipated up to 1 October 2008.
Shannon Development
No appointments were made to the Board of Shannon Development from 3 July 2007 to date and no vacancies exist at present. The two longest serving Board members retire at the Company's AGM which normally coincides with the April Board meeting. No other vacancies are anticipated between now and 1 October 2008. Appointments to the Shannon Development Board are published in Iris Oifigiúil.
National Standards Authority of Ireland
Ms Helen Curley was appointed to the Board of the National Standards Authority of Ireland on 21 January 2008. Her appointment was published in Iris Oifigiúil on 8 February 2008.
Three vacancies will arise on the Board of the National Standards Authority of Ireland on 14 April 2008.
Crafts Council of Ireland
Mr. Jim Dunne, Ms. Jean Byrne and Ms Anna Foy were appointed to the Board of the Crafts Council of Ireland on 13 September 2007
None of these appointments have yet been published in Iris Oifigúil. However, they will be published in the coming weeks.
There will be no Ministerial Board vacancies between now and the end of October 2008 on the Crafts Council of Ireland's (CCOI) Board. There will be four other vacancies on the Board and these will be filled at the Council's AGM on June 12 2008.
County and City Enterprise Boards (CEBs)
The 35 CEBs are individual companies limited by guarantee and appointment to their Boards is effected by ordinary Resolution of the Board of Directors, as set out in the Articles of Association of each Board. My Department does not have a role in such appointments.
The Health and Safety Authority
The Board of the Health and Safety Authority was appointed for a 3-year term on 20 December 2007. Details of these appointments were published in Iris Oifigiúil on 4 January 2008.
Chairperson:
Mr. Jim. Lyons
Representing employers
Ms Marian Byron
Mr. Sean Corrigan
Mr. Dermot Carey
Representing Employees
Mr. Eamon Devoy
Dessie Robinson
Ms Esther Lynch
Ministerial appointments
Ms Christina McEleney
Ms Rosy Sheerin
Mr. Pat Kearney
Ms Anne Marie Hayes
There is one current vacancy under the heading of Ministerial appointments and this appointment is likely to be made in the near future. There are no further anticipated appointments expected before 1st October 2008.
The Labour Court
Ms Paidrigín Ní Mhurchú was reappointed as a Member of the Labour Court on 3 September 2007. Her appointment was published in Iris Oifigiúil on 17 August 2008.
Mr. Jack Nash was reappointed as a Member of the Labour Court on 3 November 2007. His appointment was published in Iris Oifigiúil on 30 October 2008.
There are no vacancies expected in the Labour Court before 1 October 2007.
The Labour Relations Commission
Ms Joan Carmichael was reappointed as a Rights Commissioner on 26 July 2007, notice of her appointment was published in Iris Oifigiúl on 31 July 2007.
Mr. Jim O'Connell; Mr. Seán Reilly; Mr. John Walsh; Mr. Eugene Hanly and Ms Rosaleen Glackin were appointed as Rights Commissioners on 1 November 2007. Notice of these appointments was published in Iris Oifigiúl on 30 October 2007 except in the case of Ms Glackin, whose notice was published on 11 November 2007.
Ms Emer O'Shea and Ms Gaye Cunningham were appointed as Rights Commissioners on 1 January 2008. Notice of these appointments was published in Iris Oifigiúl on 11 January 2008.
There is one vacancy expected in the Rights Commissioner service on 22 September 2008.
Employment Appeals Tribunal
Aidan O'Mara was appointed to on 17 August 2007. Notice of his appointment was published in Iris Oifigiúl on 17 August 2007.
Ms Kate O'Mahony was reappointed as chairman of the Tribunal on 22 January 2008, notice of her appointment was published in Iris Oifigiúl on 25 January 2008.
Mr Paul Clarke and Mr Liam Tobin were appointed on 30 January 2008, notice of their appointments was published in Iris Oifigiúl on 1 February 2008.
Expert Group on Future Skills Needs
Ms Una Halligan was appointed to the Expert Group on Future Skills Needs on 18 March 2008. This appointment has not been published in Iris Oifigúil
Redundancy Panel
The Redundancy Panel may be set up under the Protection of Employment (Exceptional Collective Redundancies and Other Related Matters) Act 2007, and only comes into existence on receipt of a request for adjudication to the Secretary General from the employer or employees involved in a collective redundancy situation which is regarded by them as exceptional. The Minister also may initiate a request to the Redundancy Panel if he feels it is so warranted. The Panel, which has nominated members from ICTU and IBEC and is chaired by NIB has not yet been invoked.
Appointments to Joint Labour Committees of
1. Chairman and
2. Independent member and chairman in the absence of the Chairman
Committee
|
Appointment
|
Name
|
Date of appointment
|
Published in Iris Oifigiuil
|
Handkerchief and Household Piece Goods JLC
|
Chairman
|
Sheamus Sweeney
|
30-1-2008
|
No
|
Contract Cleaning JLC
|
Chairman
|
Brian McGinn
|
13-11- 2007
|
No
|
Contract Cleaning JLC
|
Independent member and chairman in the absence of the Chairman
|
Damien Cannon
|
13-11-2007
|
No
|
Current Vacancies in Joint Labour Committees
Body
|
Current Vacancy
|
Aerated Waters and Wholesale Bottling Joint Labour Committee
|
Independent Member
|
Agricultural Workers Joint Labour Committee
|
Chairman
|
Catering (Dublin and Dun Laoghaire) Joint Labour Committee
|
2 Independent Members
|
Hairdressing (Dublin) Joint Labour Committee
|
Independent Member
|
Handkerchief and Household Piece Goods Joint Labour Committee
|
Independent Member
|
Hotels (Dublin) Joint Labour Committee
|
Independent Member
|
Hotels (Other than Dublin, Dunlaoghaire and Cork) JLC
|
Independent Member
|
Security Industry Joint Labour Committee
|
Independent Member
|
Shirtmaking Joint Labour Committee
|
2 Independent Members
|
Tailoring Joint Labour Committee
|
Independent Member
|
Women’s Clothing and Millinery Joint Labour Committee
|
Independent Member
|
Note: Appointments of employers and workers representative members of the JLCs and vacancies for these positions are not shown as these are appointed by the Labour Court and not by the Minister.
InterTradeIreland
In accordance with the British-Irish Agreement Act 1999, the North/South Ministerial Council appoints the members of the Board of InterTradeIreland. The North/South Ministerial Council meeting in Institutional Format on the 17 December 2007 appointed the following to the Board:
Dr. David Dobbin (Chair)
Mr. John Fitzgerald (Vice Chair)
Ms. Rosaleen Doherty
Mr. Jack Gilmour
Mr. Padraig Mac Lochlainn
Dr. Gerard O'Hare
Mr. Tom Scott
Mr. Brendan Butler
Ms Patricia McKeown
Mr. Hugh Logue
Mr. Sean Gallagher
Mr. Ray Doherty
The issue of publication in Iris Oifigiúil is not applicable. These appointments are made by the North/South Ministerial Council.
Irish Auditing and Accounting Supervisory Authority (IAASA)
Mr. Gerard Scully was appointed to the Board of IAASA on 12 July 2007. Under Section 11 of the Companies Act, 2003, there is no requirement to publish in Irish Oifiguil. There are no vacancies on the Board of IASSA and none are anticipated before 1st October 2008.
National Consumer Agency
In accordance with Section 10(7) of the Consumer Protection Act, two vacancies will arise on the Board of the NCA on the anniversary of the establishment day, i.e. 1 May 2008.
High Level Group on Business Regulation
On the 6th March 2007 the Government agreed to the establishment of a new structure to facilitate the direct engagement of business with Government in tackling administrative burdens. The High Level Group had its first meeting in July 2007. Members of the Group were appointed on various dates prior to the first meeting.
Sean Gorman (Chairman)
Liam Berney
Patricia Callan
Marie Daly
Pat Delaney
Gearoid Doyle
Pat Farrell
Mark Fielding
Liam Irwin
Philip Kelly
Irene Lynch Fannon
Steve MacFeely
Ann Nolan
Tom O'Mahony
Breda Power
Advisory Group on Media Mergers
The following persons have agreed to sit on the Advisory Group:
Mr. Paul Sreenan, Senior Counsel (Chairperson)
Professor Colum Kenny, Dublin City University
Ms Olive Braiden, Arts Council
Mr. Michael O'Keeffe, The Broadcasting Commission of Ireland
Mr. Peter Cassells, National Centre for Partnership & Performance
Mr. Marc Coleman, Author, Broadcaster and Writer.
Mr. John Herlihy, Chief Executive, Google Ireland