asked the Minister for Finance if he will state the names of the directors of all State-owned companies and the date of appointment in each case and their salaries or allowances, if any.
Ceisteanna—Questions Oral Answers. - Directors of State-Owned Companies.
As the reply is in the form of a tabular statement, I propose, with the permission of the Ceann Comharle, to have it included in the Official Report.
Following is the statement, on the assumption that the term "State-owned companies" refers to companies incorporated under the Companies Acts in which the State holds all or a majority of the issued share capital:—
DIRECTORS OF STATE-OWNED COMPANIES
Name of Company |
Name of Director |
Date of appointment |
Remuneration (a year) |
Aer Rianta, Teo. |
E.T. McCarron (Chairman) |
24 March, 1949 |
£1,000 |
S.Ó hUadhaigh |
5 April, 1937 |
£300 |
|
J.J. O'Leary |
1 September, 1943 |
||
J.P. O'Brien |
5 April, 1937 |
||
J.P. Reihill |
11 May, 1946 |
||
D.Ó hIarfhlaithe |
11 May, 1946 |
||
Aer Lingus, Teo. |
E.T. McCarron (Chairman) |
8 April, 1949 |
* |
J.J. O'Leary |
1 September, 1943 |
||
J.P. O'Brien |
1 December, 1941 |
||
C. Carrigan |
28 March, 1947 |
||
Lord Douglas |
8 April, 1949 |
||
Aerlínte Éireann Teo. |
E.T. McCarron (Chairman) |
24 March, 1949 |
Nil. |
D.Ó. hIarfhlaithe |
10 March, 1947 |
||
J.P. O'Brien |
10 March, 1947 |
||
J.J. O'Leary |
10 March, 1947 |
||
J.P. Reihill |
10 March, 1947 |
||
Agricultural Credit Corporation, Ltd. |
R.C. Barton (Chairman) |
15 December, 1933(16 December, 1932, as director.) |
£800 and £200 consolidated travelling allowance |
T.F. Hennessy |
30 June, 1944 |
£300 |
|
P. Macklin |
29 October, 1948 |
£300 |
|
Alginate Industries (Ireland), Ltd. |
G. Mac an Bháird (Chairman) |
16 December, 1949 |
* |
T. Ó Scanaill (Joint Managing Director) |
16 December, 1949 |
||
A.H. Stewart (Joint Managing Director) |
16 December, 1949 |
||
A. Ó Baoighealláin |
16 December, 1949 |
||
W.H. Merton |
15 January, 1950 |
||
Ceimicí, Teo |
C.S. Almond (Deputy Chairman) |
1 October, 1946 (10 March, 1939, as Director). |
£250 |
G. Van der Lee (Managing Director). |
10 March, 1939 |
£1,600 |
|
T.S. Wheeler |
2 October, 1945 |
£150 |
|
G.P.S. Hogan |
14 June, 1939 |
||
J. Williams |
7 November, 1945 |
||
Comhlucht Siúicre Éireann, Teo. |
A.A. Odlum (Chairman) |
12 January, 1950 (4 November, 1937 as Director) |
£750 |
M.J. Behan |
23 July, 1936 |
£300 |
|
P. Cahill |
25 July, 1940 |
||
T. O'Mahony |
3 October, 1940 |
||
M. McMahon |
27 July, 1948 |
||
Dairy Disposal Company, Ltd. |
H.J. O'Friel (Chairman) |
22 January, 1935 |
£200 |
M. McAuliffe |
29 April, 1927 |
||
M.J. Horgan |
9 June, 1933 |
£100 |
|
Industrial Credit Company, Ltd. |
J.P. Colbert (Chairman and Managing Director). |
16 October, 1933 |
£2,250 |
M.W. O'Reilly |
3 June, 1943 |
£300 |
|
L.J. Kettle |
16 October, 1933 |
||
J.J. O'Leary |
16 October, 1933 |
||
J.P. Beddy |
1 June, 1949 |
Nil |
|
Irish Assurance Company, Ltd. |
W. Boland (Chairman) |
20 July, 1939 (15 March, 1939, as Director) |
* |
A.W. Bayne |
22 May, 1941 |
||
J.A. Nugent |
15 March, 1939 |
||
E. O'Brien |
15 April, 1947 |
||
D.J. O'Donoghue |
15 April, 1947 |
||
Irish National Stud Company, Ltd. |
Major-General L. Hayes (Chairman). |
18 April, 1946 |
£300 |
The Earl of Fingall |
18 April, 1946 |
£150 |
|
Capt. Charles Moore |
18 April, 1946 |
||
P.J. Ruttledge |
18 April, 1946 |
||
W. Tyrrell |
8 April, 1948 |
||
Irish News Agency |
R. Creene (Chairman) |
20 March, 1950 |
100 guineas |
C. O'Brien (Managing Director) |
20 March, 1950 |
200 ,, |
|
R. Brennan |
20 March, 1950 |
50 ,, |
|
N. Hartnett |
20 March, 1950 |
||
P. O'Curry |
20 March, 1950 |
||
Irish Shipping, Ltd. |
E.T. McCarron (Chairman) |
23 March, 1949 |
£750 |
T.D. Hallinan |
21 March, 1941 |
£500 |
|
S.J.K. Roycroft |
21 March, 1941 |
||
J.J. Stafford |
21 March, 1941 |
||
S. MacKenzie |
29 March, 1950 |
||
Irish Steel Holdings, Ltd. |
J. Williams (Chairman) |
2 April, 1947 |
£250 |
G.P.S. Hogan |
2 April, 1947 |
£150 |
|
T. O'Shea |
2 April, 1947 |
||
Mianraí, Teo |
M.A. Hogan (Chairman) |
3 August, 1949 (1 June, 1945, as Director). |
£450 |
A.J. Woods |
8 February, 1946 |
£150 |
|
E.M. Murphy |
3 August, 1949 |
||
D.W. Bishopp |
12 July, 1947 |
*The remuneration of the Directors is determined by the Company.