asked the Minister for Defence when FCA officers of the Eastern and Curragh commands, who were gazetted as 2nd lieutenants in January 1978 are likely to be promoted to lieutenant.
Written Answers. - Defence Forces.
Three of these officers were promoted to the rank of lieutenant recently. The question of the promotion of the remainder is under consideration.
486.
asked the Minister for Defence the requirements for promotion to lieutenant, captain and commandant in An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil; the retirement ages for each of these ranks; and if these are likely to change in the next two years.
The information requested by the Deputy is as follows:—
(1) Requirements for promotion to Lieutenant, Captain and Commandant in An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil:—
Promotions of officers of An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil are made by the Minister to fill vacancies in establishments. The requirements for promotion are summarised below:—
(a) completion of a minimum period of satisfactory service;
(b) attendance at a specified number of periods of annual training;
(c) general suitability for promotion.
(2) Ages for the relinquishment of their commissions by officers of An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil in the ranks of Lieutenant, Captain and Commandant:—
(i) Medical Officers, Dental Officers and Engineer Officers: Lieutenant; 65 years, Captain; 65 years, Commandant; 65 years.
(ii) Other Officers: Lieutenant; 55 years, Captain; 55 years, Commandant; 57 years.
(3) Likelihood of changes in the next two years in the requirements for promotion or the ages for the relinquishment of their commissions by officers of An Fórsa:—
The question of introducing a scheme of fixed period promotion from lieutenant to captain is currently under consideration. There are at present no further proposals to revise either the requirements for promotion or the ages for the relinquishment of their commissions by officers of An Fórsa. The conditions of services of all personnel are kept under review.
487.
asked the Minister for Defence the number of FCA and An Slua Muirí personnel on full time security duty, by rank at 31 January 1970 and 1980 and 28 February 1982.
The number and rank of FCA personnel on full-time security duty on 31 January 1980 and 28 February 1982 was as follows:—
31 January 1980 |
28 February 1982 |
|
Officers |
25 |
28 |
Non-commissioned Officers |
173 |
198 |
Privates |
159 |
146 |
Total |
387 |
372 |
There were no FCA personnel employed on full-time security duty on 31 January 1970.
Slua Muirí personnel have not been employed on these duties.
488.
asked the Minister for Defence the procedure, if any, to divest an FCA/An Slua Muirí officer of his commission where: (a) his voluntary attendance is minimal i.e. less than 24 hours per year and/or (b) he has not attended annual training for two or more years; (c) his service is regarded as unsatisfactory by his unit O.C.; and (d) other reasons; and the number of such actions in 1979, 1980 and 1981.
In accordance with sub-section (2) of section 48 of the Defence Act, 1954, the President may, for any prescribed reason, direct that an officer shall relinquish his commission. The prescribed reasons in the case of an officer of An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil or An Slua Muirí are:—
(a) that he is below the required physical standards;
(b) that he is of unsound mind;
(c) that he has failed to carry out his military obligations as required by the Act and/or Regulations made under the Act;
(d) that the relinquishment of his commission is in the interests of the service.
This function of the President is exercisably by him on the advice of the Government.
The numbers of officers whose commissions were relinquished subject to these provisions in 1979, 1980 and 1981 are as follows: 1979; 1, 1980; 4, 1981; 1.
489.
asked the Minister for Defence the establishment of the FCA and An Slua Muirí by rank and corps on 31 January 1959 and 1982.
The information sought by the Deputy is set out in the following statements:
Establishment of An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil
RANK |
Infantry |
Artillery |
Cavalry |
Engineer |
Signals |
|||||
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
|
Commandants |
— |
— |
17 |
18 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
Captains |
119 |
119 |
58 |
66 |
18 |
18 |
6 |
6 |
3 |
3 |
Lieutenants |
544 |
534 |
110 |
117 |
9 |
9 |
15 |
15 |
15 |
15 |
TOTAL OFFICERS |
663 |
653 |
185 |
201 |
27 |
27 |
21 |
21 |
18 |
18 |
Sergeants-Major |
17 |
18 |
3 |
6 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
Battalion Quartermaster Sergeants |
17 |
18 |
3 |
6 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
Company Sergeants |
85 |
83 |
20 |
21 |
3 |
3 |
3 |
3 |
3 |
3 |
Company Quartermaster Sergeants |
85 |
83 |
20 |
21 |
3 |
3 |
3 |
3 |
3 |
3 |
Sergeants |
663 |
653 |
274 |
300 |
54 |
54 |
33 |
33 |
21 |
21 |
Corporals |
2,584 |
2,526 |
316 |
357 |
45 |
45 |
60 |
60 |
72 |
72 |
TOTAL NCOs |
3,451 |
3,381 |
636 |
711 |
105 |
105 |
99 |
99 |
99 |
99 |
Privates |
11,917 |
11,645 |
2,105 |
2,304 |
396 |
396 |
567 |
567 |
243 |
243 |
TOTAL ALL RANKS |
16,031 |
15,679 |
2,926 |
3,216 |
528 |
528 |
687 |
687 |
360 |
360 |
Note: Peace establishments were reviewed in 1958 and a reorganisation of the Defence Forces was implemented with effect from 1 October 1959. establishment on the latter date is given.
Establishment of An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil
RANK |
Supply and Transport |
Medical |
Military Police |
Area Commanders |
Brigade Head-quarters |
Command FCA Staffs |
TOTAL |
|||||
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
1959 |
1982 |
|
Commandants |
— |
— |
3 |
— |
— |
— |
98 |
97 |
9 |
18 |
127 |
133 |
Captains |
3 |
3 |
3 |
12 |
3 |
6 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
213 |
233 |
Lieutenants |
21 |
21 |
15 |
36 |
12 |
24 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
741 |
771 |
TOTAL OFFICERS |
24 |
24 |
21 |
48 |
15 |
30 |
98 |
97 |
9 |
18 |
1,081 |
1,137 |
Sergeants-Major |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
20 |
24 |
Battalion Quartermaster Sergeants |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
— |
20 |
24 |
Company Sergeants |
3 |
3 |
3 |
6 |
3 |
6 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
123 |
128 |
Company Quartermaster Sergeants |
3 |
3 |
3 |
6 |
3 |
6 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
123 |
128 |
Sergeants |
27 |
27 |
30 |
60 |
33 |
66 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
1,135 |
1,214 |
Corporals |
66 |
66 |
27 |
54 |
189 |
378 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
3,359 |
3,558 |
TOTAL NCOs |
99 |
99 |
63 |
126 |
228 |
456 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
4,780 |
5,076 |
Privates |
264 |
264 |
279 |
558 |
12 |
24 |
— |
— |
— |
— |
15,783 |
16,001 |
TOTAL ALL RANKS |
387 |
387 |
363 |
732 |
255 |
510 |
98 |
97 |
9 |
18 |
21,644 |
22,214 |
Note: Peace Establishments were reviewed in 1958 and a reorganisation of the Defence Forces was implemented with effect from 1 October 1959. establishment on the latter date is given.
Establishment of an Slua Muirí
RANK |
1959 |
1982 |
Lieutenant-Commanders |
5 |
5 |
Lieutenants |
10 |
15 |
Sub-Lieutenants |
30 |
30 |
TOTAL OFFICERS |
45 |
50 |
Warrant Officers |
5 |
— |
Senior Chief Petty Officers |
— |
5 |
Chief Petty Officers |
30 |
25 |
Senior Petty Officers |
— |
5 |
Petty Officers |
40 |
80 |
Leading Seamen |
60 |
105 |
TOTAL NCOs |
135 |
220 |
Seamen |
425 |
405 |
TOTAL ALL RANKS |
605 |
675 |
Note: Peace Establishments were reviewed in 1958 and a reorganisation of the Defence Forces was implemented with effect from 1 October 1959. The establishment on the latter date is given.
490.
asked the Minister for Defence the strength of the FCA and An Slua Muirí by rank and corps on 31 January 1959, 1969 and 1982.
The following is the information requested with the exception of details relating to strength by Corps of the FCA on 31 January 1959. It is not possible from the records available to ascertain this information.
Strength by ranks and Commands of An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil on 31 January 1959
Command |
Captains |
Lieutenants |
Second Lieutenants |
Sergeant Major |
Battalion Quartermaster Sergeant |
Company Sergeant |
Company Quartermaster Sergeant |
Sergeant |
Corporals |
Privates |
East |
45 |
190 |
96 |
14 |
62 |
9 |
180 |
521 |
5,105 |
|
South |
40 |
134 |
66 |
11 |
4 |
151 |
331 |
5,519 |
||
West |
34 |
128 |
57 |
17 |
2 |
58 |
348 |
5,699 |
Strength by ranks and Corps of An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil on 31 January 1969
Corps |
Commandants |
Captains |
Lieutenants |
Second Lieutenants |
Sergeant Major |
Battalion Quarter-master Sergeant |
Company Sergeant |
Company Quarter-master Sergeant |
Sergeant |
Corporals |
Privates |
Administrative Staff |
11 |
||||||||||
Infantry |
45 |
52 |
226 |
137 |
11 |
4 |
64 |
27 |
426 |
1,369 |
11,020 |
Artillery |
12 |
34 |
37 |
17 |
1 |
10 |
4 |
153 |
185 |
1,333 |
|
Cavalry |
1 |
9 |
8 |
2 |
2 |
1 |
30 |
32 |
297 |
||
Engineering |
1 |
1 |
14 |
1 |
22 |
32 |
348 |
||||
Signals |
3 |
10 |
3 |
2 |
13 |
42 |
238 |
||||
Supply and Transport |
3 |
6 |
5 |
1 |
2 |
2 |
18 |
48 |
364 |
||
Medical |
3 |
12 |
2 |
2 |
20 |
20 |
283 |
||||
Military Police |
4 |
8 |
4 |
3 |
1 |
34 |
178 |
249 |
|||
Area Commanders |
12 |
Strength by ranks and Corps of An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil on 31 January 1982
Corps |
Commandants |
Captains |
Lieutenants |
Second Lieutenants |
Sergeant Major |
Battalion Quarter-master Sergeant |
Company Sergeant |
Company Quarter-master Sergeant |
Sergeant |
Corporals |
Privates |
Administrative Staff |
16 |
1 |
|||||||||
Infantry |
25 |
72 |
192 |
156 |
15 |
8 |
64 |
44 |
501 |
1,386 |
11,109 |
Artillery |
17 |
38 |
28 |
44 |
6 |
4 |
14 |
10 |
181 |
163 |
1,621 |
Cavalry |
8 |
7 |
7 |
3 |
2 |
41 |
32 |
315 |
|||
Engineering |
4 |
7 |
3 |
1 |
27 |
36 |
351 |
||||
Signals |
3 |
8 |
4 |
2 |
1 |
16 |
44 |
245 |
|||
Supply and Transport |
3 |
7 |
5 |
2 |
2 |
23 |
49 |
391 |
|||
Medical |
3 |
7 |
4 |
4 |
3 |
37 |
21 |
321 |
|||
Military Police |
5 |
10 |
5 |
5 |
5 |
60 |
246 |
287 |
|||
Area Commanders |
26 |
3 |
Strength by ranks of An Slua Muirí as on dates shown
Date |
Lieutenant- Commander |
Lieutenant |
Sub- Lieutenant |
Ensign |
Warrant Officer |
Senior Chief Petty Officer |
Chief Petty Officer |
Senior Petty Officer |
Petty Officer |
Leading Seaman |
Seaman |
31/1/1959 |
3 |
5 |
7 |
4 |
15 |
18 |
22 |
277 |
|||
31/1/1969 |
3 |
10 |
16 |
2 |
3 |
16 |
1 |
21 |
28 |
197 |
|
31/1/1982 |
4 |
10 |
8 |
5 |
1 |
3 |
22 |
2 |
30 |
22 |
213 |
491.
asked the Minister for Defence the establishment figure, by rank, of PDF personnel attached to the FCA and An Slua Muirí on 31 January 1959, 1969 and 1982.
The information sought by the Deputy is set out in the following statements:
Establishment of Permanent Defence Force Personnel attached to An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil.
Rank |
1st October, 1959 |
31st January 1969 |
31st January 1982 |
(1) |
(2) |
(3) |
(4) |
Colonels |
3 |
3 |
3 |
Lieutenant-Colonels |
3 |
3 |
4 |
Commandants |
38 |
38 |
63 |
Captains |
53 |
60 |
86 |
Lieutenants |
112 |
112 |
75 |
TOTAL OFFICERS |
209 |
216 |
231 |
Company Sergeants |
2 |
3 |
7 |
Company Quarter-Master Sergeants |
144 |
150 |
164 |
Sergeants |
125 |
134 |
137 |
Corporals |
203 |
207 |
220 |
TOTAL NCOs |
474 |
494 |
528 |
Privates |
260 |
282 |
243 |
TOTAL ALL RANKS |
943 |
992 |
1,002 |
Notes:
1. In addition to the figures shown in column (4) above the 1979 reorganisation of the Defence Forces provided for the establishment of a Directorate of Reserve Forces with responsibility for the development of an effective First Line Reserve and An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil. The establishment of the Directorate of Reserve Forces is 15 All Ranks (1 Colonel, 1 Lieutenant-Colonel, 3 Commandants, 2 Captains, 1 Company Sergeant, 1 Company Quartermaster Sergeant, 2 Sergeants, 1 Corporal and 3 Privates).
2. Peace Establishments were reviewed in 1958 and a reorganisation of the Defence Forces was implemented with effect from 1 October 1959. The establishment on the latter date is given.
Establishment of Permanent Defence Force Personnel attached to An Slua Muirí.
Rank |
1st October 1959 |
31st January 1969 |
31st January 1982 |
(1) |
(2) |
(3) |
(4) |
Lieutenants |
3 |
3 |
3 |
TOTAL OFFICERS |
3 |
3 |
3 |
Chief Petty Officers |
5 |
5 |
5 |
Petty Officers |
13 |
13 |
13 |
TOTAL NCOs |
18 |
18 |
18 |
TOTAL SEAMEN |
5 |
5 |
5 |
TOTAL ALL RANKS |
26 |
26 |
26 |
Notes:
1. In addition to the figures shown in columns (2), (3) and (4) above an appointment of 1 Lieutenant-Commander is provided for in the establishment of Naval Service Headquarters as Staff Officer in charge of An Slua Muirí.
2. Peace Establishments were reviewed in 1958 and a reorganisation of the Defence Forces was implemented with effect from 1 October 1959. The establishment on the latter date is given.
492.
asked the Minister for Defence the strength, by rank, of PDF personnel attached to the FCA and An Slua Muirí on 31 January 1959, 1969 and 1982.
The information requested is as follows:
An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil.
Date |
Cols |
Lt Cols |
Comdts |
Capts |
Lts |
Total Offrs |
C/S |
CQMS |
Sgts |
Cpls |
Total NCOs |
Ptes |
Total all Ranks |
31/1/59 |
1 |
1 |
24 |
25 |
— |
51 |
— |
103 |
26 |
— |
129 |
9 |
189 |
31/1/69 |
— |
— |
32 |
46 |
54 |
132 |
1 |
110 |
112 |
174 |
397 |
170 |
699 |
31/1/82 |
4 |
5 |
63 |
46 |
8 |
126 |
10 |
138 |
137 |
182 |
467 |
217 |
810 |
An Slua Muirí.
Date |
Lts |
Total Offrs |
CPOs |
POs |
Total NCOs |
Seamen |
Total all Ranks |
31/1/59 |
2 |
2 |
2 |
2 |
4 |
— |
6 |
31/1/69 |
2 |
2 |
4 |
12 |
16 |
5 |
23 |
31/1/82 |
1 |
1 |
4 |
9 |
13 |
4 |
18 |
493.
asked the Minister for Defence the number of FCA personnel differential as to Officers, NCO's and men, who completed a minimum fourteen days annual training in 1959, 1969 and 1982.
The following is the information requested, with the exception of the number of officers who completed a minimum of 14 days annual training in the years 1959 and 1969. This information is not readily available from the records held in the Department.
Year |
Officers |
Non-Commissioned Officers |
Privates |
Total |
1959 |
— |
53 |
3,788 |
3,841 |
1969 |
— |
426 |
3,706 |
4,132 |
1981 |
549 |
1,883 |
3,489 |
5,921 |
494.
asked the Minister for Defence the establishment and strength, by rank, of the observer corps at 31 January 1972 and 1982; and the role of the corps.
The appended statement gives the activated establishment and strength by rank of the Observer Corps at 31 January 1972 and 1982.
The activated Observer Corps has as its main role, in conjunction with the Civil Defence Organisation, the monitoring of nuclear explosions and consequential radio-active fall-out and the preparation of appropriate warnings to the public.
The Observer Corps — Permanent Defence Force.
Rank |
31st January, 1972 |
31st January, 1982 |
||
Activated Establishment |
Strength |
Activated Establishment |
Strength |
|
Colonels |
1 |
1 |
1 |
1 |
Lieutenant-Colonels |
1 |
1 |
1 |
1 |
Commandants |
4 |
4 |
4 |
4 |
Captains |
4 |
2 |
4 |
— |
TOTAL OFFICERS |
10 |
8 |
10 |
6 |
Company Sergeants |
1 |
— |
1 |
1 |
Company Quartermaster Sergeants |
4 |
3 |
4 |
4 |
Sergeants |
6 |
5 |
6 |
6 |
Corporals |
1 |
— |
1 |
1 |
TOTAL NCOs |
12 |
8 |
12 |
12 |
Privates |
9 |
— |
9 |
1 |
TOTAL ALL RANKS |
31 |
16 |
31 |
19 |
495.
asked the Minister for Defence whether it is intended to separate the appointments of Company Commander and Area Commander in An Fórsa Cosanta Áitiúil as some officers at the moment hold dual appointments while others have separate appointments.
The appointments of company commander and area commander are separate appointments in the ranks of captain and commandant respectively. In some areas both appointments are filled by the same officer. This arises where there is no suitable officer available for appointment as company commander.
This arrangement does not interfere with the promotion prospects of other officers.