The following appointments have been made to boards and bodies within my Department between January 2003 and mid June 2004: On 6 March, 2003, Mr. Pádraig McManus was appointed as a member of the advisory board for Development Co-operation Ireland. Mr. McManus is an additional member of the board and was not appointed to replace anybody else. On 4 September, 2003, Mr. Chris Flood was appointed to succeed Mr. Desmond O'Malley as chairperson of the board.
Ms Morina O'Neill was appointed a member of the development education advisory committee on 8 May, 2003, replacing Ms Annette Honan. On the same date, Mr. Robert Kirkpatrick replaced Mr. Hugh O'Neill as the Department of Education and Science's representative on the committee.
On 24 October, 2003, Mr. Peter Johnson replaced Ms Frances Leahy as the representative of the National Council for Curriculum and Assessment on the Committee.
The following persons were appointed to the board of APSO since January 2003: Ms Catherine Boylan replaced Mr. Donal McDonald on 20 January 2003; Mr. Aidan O'Connor was appointed to a pre-existing vacancy on 1 August, 2003; Mr. Pat Bourne replaced Ms Helen Browne on 12 September 2003. Since 1 January 2004, APSO has been integrated into Development Co-operation Ireland. It is expected that the board of APSO will be wound up shortly.