In response to the Deputy’s question the following appointments were made to State boards under the aegis of my Department since the Government took office.
An Post National Lottery
Name of Appointee
|
Date Appointed
|
Remuneration Y/N
|
If Yes state Amount
|
Was appointment made in accordance with new procedures
|
Mr. Donal Connell - Chairman
|
re-appointed
February 29th 2012.
|
No, on the basis that both individuals are also members of the board of An Post
|
N/A
|
See below
|
Mr. Peter Quinn – Director
|
16 February 2012
|
No, on the basis that both individuals are also members of the board of An Post
|
N/A
|
See below
|
The position to which Mr. Connell was re-appointed by me as Minister for Public Expenditure and Reform was not advertised as under the National Lottery Act 1986, the majority shareholder of the National Lottery Company (i.e. An Post) nominates the person to fill this position. On 22nd November 2011, I re-appointed Mr Connell as chairman until 29th February 2012 in order to allow him time to appear before the Joint Oireachtas Committee on Finance Public Expenditure and Reform. Mr Connell appeared before the Committee on 14th December 2011 and his re-appointment as Chairman has been ratified with effect from the 29th February 2012.
Mr Quinn was nominated by An Post and appointed by myself hence the position was not advertised on the Department’s website.
Civil Service Arbitration Board
Name of Appointee
|
Date Appointed
|
Remuneration Y/N
|
If Yes state Amount
|
Was appointment made in accordance with new procedures
|
Mr. John A Doherty (Chair)
|
19 July 2012
|
Yes
|
590 per sitting
|
See below
|
Mr. Gerard Barry
|
19 July 2012
|
|
416 per sitting
|
|
Mr. Tom Wall
|
19 July 2012
|
|
416 per sitting
|
|
Mr. George Maybury
|
19 July 2012
|
|
416 per sitting
|
|
Mr. Hugh O'Flaherty
|
19 July 2012
|
|
416 per sitting
|
|
Appointment was by Government following agreement with the staff side in accordance with the terms of the Conciliation and Arbitration Scheme and will expire on 30 June 2014.
Mr Wall who sits on the Arbitration Boards for the Civil Service and Teachers receives an annual retainer of €4,625 to cover 11 sitting days.
Public Appointments Service
Name of Appointee
|
When individual was appointed
|
Remuneration Y/N
|
If Yes state Amount
|
Was appointment made in accordance with new procedures
|
Mr. Eddie Sullivan, Chairman
Mr. Des Dowling, Assistant Secretary - Department of the Environment, Community and Local Government
Dr Deirdre O’Keeffe, Assistant Secretary - Department of Justice and Equality
Ms. Patricia Coleman, Director - Department of Public Expenditure and Reform
Mr. Seán McGrath - National Director of HR in the HSE (has since resigned)
Ms Judith Eve – former Chairperson the Civil Service Commissioners, Northern Ireland
Dr. Eddie Molloy – Management Consultant
Mr. Dan Murphy, former General Secretary of the PSEU
Mr. Bryan Andrews as CEO of the PAS holding office on an ex officio basis.
Replaced by Ms. Fiona Tierney, CEO, PAS
|
8 were appointed on 1st September 2011 (1 has since resigned)
1 appointed on ex officio basis on taking up appointment as CEO of PAS on 20th March 2012
|
1 Chairperson paid and 3 Board Members paid
Other Board Members are unpaid
|
Chairperson – €11,970 pa
3 Board Members – €7,695 pa each
|
See below
|
Eight external board members were appointed to the Board of PAS in September 2011. The posts were not advertised on the PAS website.
The Public Service Management (Recruitment and Appointments) Act, 2004 states that I, as Minister for Public Expenditure and Reform (in consultation with Minister for the Environment, Community and Local Government, the Minister for Health and the Minister for Justice, Equality and Defence) should appoint members of the Board of the Public Appointments Service.
The Board is meant to be representative of our client base. The majority of the board is therefore civil or public servants, nominated by the relevant Minister. There is also a union representative nominated by ICTU. I reappointed the outgoing Chairman and the two external members were appointed by me because of their expertise in strategic change and public service recruitment respectively.