Gerry Adams
Question:416. Deputy Gerry Adams asked the Minister for Arts, Heritage and the Gaeltacht if he will report on the new procedures the Government have introduced for appointments to State boards. [3569/13]
View answerDáil Éireann Debate, Tuesday - 22 January 2013
416. Deputy Gerry Adams asked the Minister for Arts, Heritage and the Gaeltacht if he will report on the new procedures the Government have introduced for appointments to State boards. [3569/13]
View answerThe following table sets out all appointments to State boards under the aegis of my Department since my appointment as Minister for Arts, Heritage and the Gaeltacht.
It also indicates where those appointments were made in accordance with new procedures whereby my Department seeks expressions of interest from the public by advertising on my Department's website and, also, whereby proposed appointees to the position of Chairperson are required to make themselves available to appear before the relevant Oireachtas committee.
State board |
Board members appointed since March 2011 |
Chairs appointed since March 2011 |
Date of appointment |
Appointed following public announcement and invitation of expressions of interest? |
Chair required to appear before Oireachtas Committee? |
Arts Council |
Éimear O'Connor Ciarán Walsh Mark O'Regan John Fanning |
N/A |
13/09/2011 13/09/2011 13/09/2011 07/10/2011 |
Yes |
N/A |
Heritage Council |
Ciara Breathnach Kieran O’Conor Ted Creedon Catherine Heaney Fidelma Mullane Michael Parsons |
N/A |
All appointments made on 25/01/2012 |
Yes |
N/A |
National Concert Hall |
Kieran Tobin (Chair) Dearbhla Collins John McGrane Laurie Cearr Gina Menzies Bruce Arnold Margaret Ryan Ray Bates Alma Hynes Artemis Kent Deborah Kelleher Peter McEvoy Pat Heneghan Rachel Holstead Patricia Slavin |
Kieran Tobin |
Chair appointed on 30/08/2011 All other appointments made on 11/07/2011 |
Yes |
Yes |
National Gallery |
Fred Krehbiel |
N/A |
08/06/2011 |
No – the appointment was underway prior to the introduction of the new arrangements. |
N/A |
Crawford Art Gallery |
John R. Bowen (Chair) Sheila Maguire Noel O'Keefe Úna Feely Jim Corr Tim Brosnan Tim Lucey |
John R. Bowen |
All appointments made in December 2011 |
No – all of the appointments were reappointments. |
N/A |
Chester Beatty Library |
Patricia Donlon Declan Downey |
N/A |
P Donlon appointed in November 2011 D Downey appointed in May 2012 |
Yes |
N/A |
National Archives Advisory Council |
Paul Rousse Mary McAuliffe |
N/A |
Both appointments made on 03/02/2012 |
No – the appointments were underway prior to the introduction of the new arrangements. |
N/A |
Irish Manuscripts Commission |
James McGuire (Chair) Nicholas Canny David Dickson David Edwards Chris Flynn Greta Jones James Kelly Michael Kennedy Máire Mac Conghail John McCafferty Aileen McClintock Deirdre McMahon Donal Moore Thomas O'Connor Dáibhí Ó Cróinín Ruan O'Donnell Mary O'Dowd Jane Ohlmeyer Fiona Ross |
James McGuire |
All appointments made in November 2011 |
No – all of the appointments were reappointments. |
N/A |
Údarás na Gaeltachta |
Anna Ní Ghallachair* (Chair) Dairíona Nic Con Iomaire* Pádraig Ó hAinifín* Fiachra Ó Céilleachair* Eunan Mac Cuinneagáin Micheál Ó Scanaill Séamus Cosaí Mac Gearailt Seán Ó Cuireán Seosamh Ó Laoi Ian Mac Aindriú Cathal Seoighe |
Anna Ní Ghallachair |
All appointments made on 20/11/12 |
Four* of the appointees were nominated by local authorities under the terms of the relevant legislation. The nomination of another local authority has yet to be ratified. Expressions of interest were sought for the remaining seven positions. |
Yes |
For completeness, the table below sets out appointments to the boards of Foras na Gaeilge and the Ulster-Scots Agency, which comprise An Foras Teanga, a North South Implementation Body. Appointments to the boards of such bodies are made by the North South Ministerial Council, arising from nominations on a 50:50 basis from each jurisdiction.
State board |
Board members appointed since March 2011 |
Chairs appointed since March 2011 |
Date of appointment |
Appointed following public announcement and invitation of expressions of interest? |
Chair required to appear before Oireachtas Committee? |
Foras na Gaeilge |
Liam Ó Maolmhichíl (Chair) Eoghan Mac Cormaic (Vice-Chair) Pól Callaghan Colm Cavanagh Áine Ní Chiaráin Bríd Ní Chonghoile Liam Kennedy Seosamh Mac Donnchadha Tomás Mac Eochagáin Marcus Mac Ruairí Seán Mícheal Ó Dómhnaill Dónal Ó hAiniféin Therese Ruane Tomás Sharkey Cáitríona Ní Shúilleabháin Éamonn Ó Gríbín |
Liam Ó Maolmhichíl |
Éamonn Ó Gríbín appointed on 20/04/2012 All other appointments made on 13/12/2011 |
N/A |
N/A |
Ulster Scots Agency |
Tom Scott (Chair) Tony Crooks (Vice-Chair) Ida Fisher William Leatham Val O’Kelly Hilary Singleton Sharon Treacy-Dunne Trevor Wilson |
Tom Scott |
All appointments made on 13/12/2011 |
N/A |
N/A |