I wish to advise the Deputy that there have been 64 appointments made to State Boards under the aegis of my Department in the period March 2011 to January 2013 and details of these are set out in the table. All of the appointments have been made in light of the objectives of the organisation and on the basis of appointees having the necessary competencies, expertise and experience to contribute effectively to the work of the particular boards, whilst also taking into consideration the legislative requirements where applicable.
I have, for the past two years, on the Department’s website, invited Expressions of Interest from persons wishing to be considered for appointment to vacancies on State Boards under the aegis of my Department. I have recently advertised on the website of my Department for persons interested in such appointments during 2013.
It should be noted that such invitations are designed to extend the range of suitable persons from which a Minister might make appointments – not to constrain that range.
Body
|
Appointee
|
Date Appointed
|
An Post
|
Mr Donal Connell CEO (ex officio)
Mr James Wrynn
Mr Paul Henry
Mr Noel Adamson (worker director)
Mr Patrick Compton (worker director reappointed)
Mr Thomas Devlin (worker director reappointed)
Mr William Mooney (worker director)
Ms Martina O’Connell (worker director)
Mr William Scally
Ms Lorraine Tormey
|
14/08/2011
15/09/2011
15/09/2011
01/11/2012
01/11/2012
01/11/2012
01/11/2012
01/11/2012
11/12/2012
01/01/2013
|
Bord na Móna
|
Ms Denise Cronin
*Mr. John Horgan (Chairperson)
Mr Gerard O’Donoghue
Ms Elaine Treacy
Mr Barry Walsh
|
15/09/2011
24/04/2012 (as a Director) 27/09/2012 (as Chairperson)
02/10/2012
17/07/2012
16/10/2012
|
Bord Gais Eireann
|
Mr Finbarr Kennelly
|
11/12/2012
|
EirGrid
|
Dr Gary Healy
*Ms Regina Moran
*Mr Liam O’Halloran
Ms Bride Rosney
Ms Doireann Barry
|
15/09/2011
15/09/2011
15/09/2011
15/09/2011
22/12/2011
|
ESB
|
Mr Lochlann Quinn (Chairman – reappointed)
Mr Pat O’Doherty (CEO ex officio)
Ms Noreen Wright
Mr Seamus Mallon (reappointed)
Ms Anne Butler
|
21/01/2013
09/01/2013
28/06/2011
03/05/2011
13/11/2012
|
Irish National Petroleum Corporation (INPC)
|
Mr Sean Fitzgerald (reappointed)
Mr Vincent Caffrey (reappointed)
Ms Aoife MacEvilly (reappointed)**
Mr Aidan Donnelly – Chairperson (reappointed)
|
01/06/2011
01/06/2011
18/07/2012
18/07/2012
|
National Oil Reserves Agency (NORA)
|
Ms Aoife MacEvilly **
Mr Pat Meehan CEO (ex officio) (reappointed)
|
11/04/2011
01/01/2013
|
TG4
|
Mr. Micheál Seoighe
Ms. Mairéad Ní Cheoinín
*Mr. Joe Connolly
*Mr. Des Geraghty
Ms. Andréa Ní Éalaithe
Ms Mairead Nic Suibhne
Ms. Michelle Ní Chróinín
Siún Ní Raghallaigh (Chairperson)
|
17/04/2012
17/04/2012
17/04/2012
17/04/2012
17/04/2012
17/04/2012
17/04/2012
17/04/2012
|
Sustainable Energy Authority of Ireland (SEAI)
|
*Ms Julie O’Neill
Mr. Edgar Morgenroth
Mr. Michael Conlon
Ms. Anne Farrell
Mr. Declan Waugh
Ms. Michelle Green
Mr. Brian Carroll (reappointed)**
Mr. Brendan Halligan (re-appointed) (Chairperson)
Dr Brian Motherway CEO (ex officio)
|
15/09/2011
24/04/2012
15/09/2011 (but resigned on 21/08/2012)
24/04/2012
29/05/2012
29/05/2012
26/06/2012
01/10/2012
01/05/2012
|
Digital Hub Development Agency (DHDA)
|
*Mr. Paul Holden
Mr. Seamus Ratigan
Mr Leonard Donnelly (Chairperson - reappointed)
|
29/05/2012
29/05/2012
24/11/12012
|
Ordnance Survey Ireland (OSi)
|
Mr. Ronan O’Reilly (Chairperson)
Ms. Anne Butler
Mr. Robin Simpson
Dr. Enda Howley
Dr. Denis Kelliher
Ms. Marion Coy
Mr. Justin Gleeson
Ms Sandra Ryan
*Mr. Padraic Jordan
Mr. Oliver Hickey
Mr Noel Ward
|
22/05/2012
22/05/2012 (but resigned on 25/10/2012)
22/05/2012
22/05/2012
22/05/2012
22/05/2012
22/05/2012
22/05/201222/05/2012
19/06/2012
21/12/2012
|
The Mining Board
|
Mr Michael Neary (reappointed)
|
17/11/2011
|
*Expression of Interest received
** Official in my Department
It should also be noted that 24 of the appointments in the table were either ex-officio appointments, reappointments, the appointment of worker directors chosen by election, or appointments made from nominations made by an Oireachtas Committee