The attendance records for Central Bank board meetings, for the period 2006-2009, are set out in the following schedule. In relation to remuneration, Directors’ fees from 2006-2008 and part of 2009 were €17,500 per annum. In May 2009, Directors fees were revised downwards by 10% to €15,750 per annum.
Central Bank and Financial Services Authority of Ireland
Attendance at Board Meetings
-
|
2006
|
2007
|
2008
|
2009
|
Total Number of Meetings Held
|
11
|
11
|
15
|
12
|
Number of Meetings Attended by:
|
|
|
|
|
Liam Barron
|
11
|
61
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
David Begg
|
9
|
9
|
13
|
11
|
Tom Considine
|
62
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
Gerard Danaher
|
6
|
8
|
14
|
8
|
Friedhelm Danz
|
93
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
Roy Donovan
|
10
|
10
|
44
|
n/a
|
David Doyle
|
55
|
10
|
13
|
11
|
John Dunne
|
11
|
10
|
15
|
12
|
Jim Farrell6
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
10
|
11
|
Alan Gray
|
n/a7
|
11
|
12
|
10
|
Tony Grimes
|
n/a
|
48
|
14
|
12
|
Brian Hillery
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
69
|
10
|
Patrick Honohan
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
310
|
John Hurley
|
11
|
11
|
1311
|
912
|
Patrick Neary
|
1013
|
11
|
13
|
014
|
Dermot O’Brien
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
12
|
12
|
Mary O’Dea15
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
12
|
Martin O’Donoghue
|
10
|
11
|
316
|
n/a
|
Liam O’Reilly
|
117
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
Brian Patterson
|
10
|
8
|
018
|
n/a
|
Deirdre Purcell
|
11
|
10
|
13
|
11
|
1. Liam Barron retired as Director General in August 2007
2. Tom Considine ceased to be a member of the Board on 30 June 2006 on his retirement as Secretary General of the Department of Finance.
3. Friedhelm Danz retired from the Board on 26 October 2006.
4. Roy Donovan retired as a Director in April 2008
5. David Doyle appointed as a Director July 2006
6. Jim Farrell appointed as Chairman of the Irish Financial Services Regulatory Authority in May 2008
7. Alan Gray appointed as a Director in December 2006
8. Tony Grimes appointed as Director General August 2007
9. Brian Hillery appointed as a Director in May 2008
10. Patrick Honohan appointed as Governor in September 2009
11. Tony Grimes, Director General, was appointed acting Governor from 19 July until 19 September 2008
12. John Hurley retired as Governor on 25 September 2009
13. Patrick Neary appointed as Chief Executive of the Irish Financial Services Regulatory Authority in February 2006
14. Patrick Neary retired as Chief Executive of the Irish Financial Services Regulatory Authority in January 2009
15. Mary O’Dea appointed Acting Chief Executive of the Irish Financial Services Regulatory Authority in January 2009
16. Martin O’Donoghue retired as a Director in April 2008
17. Liam O’Reilly retired as Chief Executive of the Irish Financial Services Regulatory Authority in January 2006
18. Brian Patterson retired as Chairman of the Authority in April 2008