In the period of the Government’s term of office up to 30 September 2013, the latest date for which information is available, the appointments set out in the Table were made to the Boards of State Bodies under the aegis of my Department.
Agency / Board
|
Name of Appointee
|
Date of Appointment
|
|
Dr. Mary Kelly (Chairperson)
|
29/08/2011
|
|
Mr. Conall Boland (Deputy Chairperson)
|
01/01/2012
|
|
Ms. Mary MacMahon
|
27/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Michael Leahy
|
14/05/2012
|
|
Mr. Nicholas Mulcahy
|
21/05/2012
|
|
Mr. Gabriel Dennison
|
21/05/2012
|
|
Mr. Paddy Keogh
|
21/05/2012
|
|
Ms. Oznar Yucel-Finn
|
28/01/2013
|
An Bord Pleanála *
|
Mr. Robert Ryan
|
28/01/2013
|
|
Prof. Niamh Brennan (Chairperson)
|
01/05/2012
|
|
Mr. Niall Coveney
|
01/05/2012
|
|
Mr. Dónall Curtin
|
01/05/2012
|
|
Ms. Yvonne Farrell
|
01/05/2012
|
|
Mr. Mark Griffin (Departmental staff member)
|
01/05/2012
|
|
Mr. Brendan Malone
|
01/05/2012
|
|
Ms. Catherine Mullarkey
|
01/05/2012
|
|
Mr. John Tierney (Chairperson)
|
01/06/2012
|
|
Mr. Gerry Grimes
|
01/06/2012
|
|
Dr. Philip Matthews
|
01/06/2012
|
|
Ms. Lucy McCafferty
|
01/06/2012
|
|
Mr. Charlie Murphy
|
01/06/2012
|
|
Ms. Imelda Reynolds
|
01/06/2012
|
|
Mr. Michael Stubbs
|
01/06/2012
|
Dublin Docklands Development Authority Executive Board**
|
Mr. Frank Walsh
|
01/06/2012
|
|
Ms. Laura Burke (Director General)
|
08/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Dara Lynott (Deputy Director General)
|
12/07/2012
|
|
Mr. Gerard O'Leary
|
08/05/2012
|
Environmental Protection Agency*
|
Mr. Mícheál Ó Cinnéide
|
25/08/2013
|
|
Dr. Michelle Norris (Chairperson)
|
22/02/2012
|
|
Mr. John Hogan (Department of Finance nominee)
|
22/02/2012
|
|
Mr. Phillip Nugent (Departmental representative)
|
22/02/2012
|
|
Ms. Jackie Maguire (CCMA representative)
|
13/03/2012
|
|
Mr. Colm Brophy
|
13/03/2012
|
|
Mr. Michael Murray
|
13/03/2012
|
|
Mr. Padraic Cafferty
|
21/03/2012
|
|
Dr. Mary Lee Rhodes
|
21/03/2012
|
|
Mr. Jim Miley
|
30/04/2012
|
|
Ms. Michelle Murphy Lawless
|
30/04/2012
|
|
Mr. Gerry Leahy
|
30/04/2012
|
Housing Finance Agency
|
Mr. Barry O'Leary (CEO, ex-Officio)
|
26/08/2013
|
|
Ms. Breda Collins (Chairperson)
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. John Considine
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Michael Cuddihy
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Tom Doyle
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Brendan McGrath
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Paul Murphy
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Seamus O'Neill
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Martin O'Sullivan
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Ms. Anne Ryan
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Ms. Lola O'Sullivan
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Christy McDonagh
|
21/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Tim O'Sullivan (Departmental representative)
|
21/11/2011
|
Irish Water Safety
|
Mr. Odran Reid
|
27/06/2012
|
|
Mr. Rich Howlin (Chairperson)
|
21/12/2011
|
|
Mr. Conor Skehan (Chairperson replaced Mr Rich Howlin))
|
01/07/2013
|
|
Mr. Eddie Lewis (Departmental representative)
|
21/12/2011
|
|
Ms. Marie McLaughlin (Department of Public Expenditure & Reform representative)
|
21/12/2011
|
|
Mr. Peter Carey, County Manager, Laois County Council
|
21/12/2011
|
|
Ms. Ann McGuinness
|
21/12/2011
|
|
Ms. Clodagh Heneghan
|
21/12/2012
|
|
Mr. Dermot Nolan (Department of Public Expenditure & Reform representative)
|
21/12/2012
|
|
Mr. John O Connor
|
21/12/2012
|
|
Mr. Donal McManus
|
21/12/2012
|
|
Mr. Michael Layde (Departmental representative)
|
01/08/2012
|
Housing and Sustainable Communities Agency
|
Mr. Tony O’Brien
|
01/07/2013
|
|
Mr. Eddie Breen (Chairperson), County Manager, Wexford County Council
|
01/01/2012
|
|
Mr. Michael Malone, County Manager, Kildare County Council
|
01/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Barry Quinlan (Departmental representative)
|
23/11/2011
|
Local Government Computer Services Board***
|
Mr. Enda Holland (Department of Public Expenditure & Reform representative)
|
22/02/2012
|
|
Mr. Eddie Breen (Chairperson), County Manager, Wexford County Council
|
01/01/2012
|
|
Mr. Donal Enright (Departmental representative)
|
01/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Michael Malone, County Manager, Kildare County Council
|
01/11/2011
|
Local Government Management Services Board***
|
Mr. Barry Quinlan (Departmental representative)
|
23/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Eddie Breen (Chairperson), County Manager, Wexford County Council
|
20/09/2012
|
|
Mr. Peter Carey, County Manager, Laois County Council
|
20/09/2012
|
|
Mr. Hubert Kearns, County Manager, Sligo County Council
|
20/09/2012
|
|
Mr. Michael Malone, County Manager, Kildare County Council
|
20/09/2012
|
|
Mr. Eddie Sheehy, County Manager, Wicklow County Council
|
20/09/2012
|
|
Mr. John Tierney, City Manager, Dublin City Council
|
20/09/2012
|
|
Mr. Barry Quinlan (Departmental representative)
|
24/09/2012
|
|
Mr. Donal Enright (Departmental representative)
|
24/09/2012
|
|
Mr. Paul McDonald (Departmental representative)
|
24/09/2012
|
|
Mr. Martin Riordan, Cork County Manager
|
18/10/2012
|
|
Mr. Michael Walsh, Waterford City Manager
|
18/10/2012
|
Local Government Management Agency***
|
Mr Danny McLoughlin, Westmeath County Manager
|
21/02/2013
|
|
Ms. Catriona Walsh (Chairperson)
|
16/04/2013
|
|
Mr. Tim Ryan
|
17/02/2012
|
|
Ms. Tricia Sheehy Skeffington
|
17/02/2012
|
|
Ms. Paula O’Reilly (Departmental staff member)
|
22/03/2012
|
|
Mr. Noel Merrick
|
01/04/2013
|
|
Mr Paul Flood (HSE)
|
01/04/2013
|
|
Mr. John Fitzgerald
|
01/04/2013
|
Private Residential Tenancies Board
|
Ms Rhonda Donaghey
|
16/04/2013
|
|
Professor William Reville (Chairperson)
|
16/01/2012
|
|
Dr. Maurice Fitzgerald (Dental Council)
|
19/10/2011
|
|
Dr. Paraic James (public servant)
|
16/01/2012
|
|
Dr. Patricia Cunningham (public servant)
|
20/02/2012
|
|
Mr. John O'Dea
|
30/11/2012
|
|
Ms. Darina Muckian
|
30/11/2012
|
|
Ms. Adi Roche
|
30/11/2012
|
|
Dr. Patrick Gilligan
|
30/11/2012
|
Radiological Protection Institute Ireland
|
Dr. Stephanie Ryan
|
16/09/2013
|
* Appointments to An Bord Pleanála and to the Board of the Environmental Protection Agency are of a full-time executive nature and are governed by statutory processes
** The board of the Dublin Docklands Development Authority was reappointed for an additional month from 1 May 2012 and replaced by a new board from 1 June 2012 which will continue in place until 30 June 2014.
*** Appointments of the Local Authority Manager members of the Boards of the Local Government Computer Services Board, the Local Government Management Services Board and the Local Government Management Agency (which was established on 1 August 2012, replacing the LGCSB and the LGMSB), are made by the County and City Managers collectively.
A notice was placed on my Department’s website on 19 July 2011, seeking expressions of interest from suitably qualified and experienced persons, for consideration as members or chairpersons of the boards of State bodies under the aegis of my Department. Vacancies on the boards of other bodies under my Department’s aegis will be notified on the website as they arise. However, expressions of interest can be made at any time and will be kept on file in my Department for consideration as vacancies occur. In considering applications, due regard is had to the requirements of the position, the qualifications, experience and expertise of applicants. In considering applications, due regard is also had to Government policy regarding gender balance on State boards.
All appointments are made in accordance with the appropriate legislation governing appointments to each body. In some cases statutory selection procedures must be followed or nominations must be sought from independent nominating panels before appointments are made by the Minister or the Government, as appropriate. In a number of situations, only some appointments to the body concerned are made by the Minister, or appointments are made with the consent of another Minister.
The Water Services Act 2013 provided for the establishment of Irish Water as a subsidiary of Bord Gáis Éireann (BGE) under the Companies Acts. The Memorandum and Articles of Association, provide that the appointment of directors is the responsibility of the Board of BGE, with the approval of the Minister for the Environment, Community and Local Government and the Minister for Communications, Energy and Natural Resources. 12 directors have been appointed to the Board of Irish Water by BGE, for the period to July 2014, and these appointments were approved in advance by the Minister and the Minister for Communications Energy and Natural Resources.
The following have been appointed to the Board of Irish Water:
Agency / Board
|
Name of Appointee
|
Date of Appointment
|
|
Ms. Rose Hynes (Chair)
|
July 2013
|
|
Mr. Michael McNicholas
|
July 2013
|
|
Mr. John Tierney
|
July 2013
|
|
Ms. Margaret Rae
|
July/2013
|
|
Mr. Philip Lee
|
November 2013
|
|
Ms. Hilary Quinlan
|
November 2013
|
|
Ms. Regina Finn
|
November 2013
|
|
Mr. Colman Sheehy
|
November 2013
|
|
Mr. Billy Moore
|
November 2013
|
|
Mr. Brian McKeown
|
November 2013
|
|
Mr. Sean Kelly
|
November 2013
|
Irish Water
|
Ms. Jacqueline Hall
|
November 2013
|
In addition, although not a State Board in the traditional sense, appointments to the Board of Pobal, a not-for-profit company, fall to be made by the Government having considered nominees from a range of stakeholders. The following persons have been appointed to the Board of Pobal during this Government’s term:
Agency / Board
|
Name of Appointee
|
Date of Appointment
|
|
Mr. Séamus Boland (Chair)
|
03/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Tommy Maguire
|
03/11/2011
|
|
Mr. Liam Keane
|
03/11/2011
|
|
Ms. Jennifer McHugh
|
11/01/2012
|
|
Ms. Mari Hurley
|
11/01/2011
|
|
Mr. William Cotter
|
09/10/2012
|
|
Mr. Gerald Quain
|
09/10/2012
|
|
Cllr. John Kelleher
|
23/10/2012
|
|
Ms. Ann Costello
|
23/10/2012
|
Pobal
|
Ms. Mary Mooty
|
05/02/2013
|
In addition, the following members were appointed to the National Traveller Accommodation Consultative Committee on 11 September 2013;
- Dr. Eoin O'Sullivan (Chairperson)
- Mr. Conor Smith
- Mr. Séamus O'Connor
- Ms. Ronnie Fay
- Mr. Eugene Cummins
- Ms. Philomena Poole
- Cllr. Finnan McCoy
- Cllr. John Kennedy
- Ms. Catherine Linehan
- Mr. Tom Coughlan
- Ms. Colette Spears
- Mr. Jim Ganley (Departmental representative)
- Ms. Mary Connors
Finally, the following members have been appointed to the Building Regulation Advisory Body:
Name of Appointee
|
Date of Appointment
|
Mr Aidan O’Connor (Departmental Staff representative)
|
19/04/2011
|
Paul Kelly
|
19/04/2011
|
Conor Taaffe
|
16/06/2011
|