The statutory bodies operating under the aegis of the Department of Social Protection are the Citizens Information Board, the Pensions Authority, the Pensions Council, the Pensions Ombudsman (which does not have a Board) and the Social Welfare Tribunal.
Details relating to the Boards, as requested by the Deputy, are outlined in the following tables.
Appointments to Boards from 7 March to Date
Name of Board or Agency
|
Name of appointee
|
Date of appointment
|
Date of Re-appointment
|
Appointed through public application or otherwise
|
Citizens Information Board
|
Eugene McErlean
|
7 September 2011
|
27 April 2014
|
Public Appointments Service process
|
|
Fiona Ward (Department of Social Protection)
|
1 November 2011
|
1 September 2012
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
|
David Stratton
|
5 November 2012
|
|
Staff representative
|
|
Simonetta Ryan (Department of Social Protection)
|
14 March 2014
|
Replaced by Tim Duggan (Department of Social Protection)
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
|
Noeline Blackwell
|
4 March 2015
|
|
Re-appointment. Initially appointed 4 March 2010.
|
|
Josephine Henry
|
4 March 2015
|
|
Re-appointment. Initially appointed 4 March 2010.
|
|
Tim Duggan (Department of Social Protection)
|
12 June 2015
|
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
|
Ita Mangan (Chairperson)
|
12 June 2015
|
|
Appointed in line with section 9.1.4 of Guidelines on Appointments to State Boards.
|
|
Anne Marie Cassidy (Department of Social Protection)
|
21 September 2015
|
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
|
Sean Sheridan
|
17 November 2015
|
|
Representative of the National Association of Citizens Information Services
|
Name of Board or Agency
|
Name of appointee
|
Date of appointment
|
Appointed through public application or otherwise
|
Pensions Authority
|
David Begg
|
12 January 2016
|
Appointed in line with section 9.1.4 of Guidelines on Appointments to State Boards.
|
|
Dr. Orlaigh Quinn (Department of Social Protection)
|
7 March 2014 (Replaced by Anne Vaughan, Department of Social Protection
|
Dr. Orlaigh Quinn (Department of Social Protection)
|
|
Anne Vaughan
(Department of Social Protection)
|
14 May 2014
|
Ex-officio appointment replacing Dr. Orlaigh Quinn)
|
|
Ann Nolan (Department of Finance)
|
7 March 2014
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
Pensions Council
|
Jim Murray
|
3 February 2015
|
Appointment was announced on 6 March 2014. As this announcement pre dated the publication of the Guidelines on Appointments to State Boards in November 2014, the Department of Public Expenditure and Reform indicated that the appointment process could continue as announced.
|
|
Roma Burke
|
3 February 2015
|
Public Appointments Service process
|
|
Kirsty Flynn
|
3 February 2015
|
Public Appointments Service process
|
|
Anthony Gilhawley
|
3 February 2015
|
Public Appointments Service process
|
|
Brendan Keenan
|
3 February 2015
|
Public Appointments Service process
|
|
Shane Whelan
|
3 February 2015
|
Public Appointments Service process
|
|
Sandra Rockett
|
3 February 2015
|
Public Appointments Service process
|
|
Sinead Ryan
|
3 February 2015
|
Public Appointments Service process
|
|
Brendan Kennedy (Pensions Regulator)
|
3 February 2015
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
|
Peter Brazel (Department of Public Expenditure and Reform)
|
3 February 2015
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
|
Marie Louise Delahunty (Central Bank)
|
3 February 2015
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
|
Helen McDonald (Department of Social Protection)
|
3 February 2015
|
Ex-officio appointment.
|
Name of Board
or Agency
|
Name of appointee
|
Date of appointment
|
Date of re-appointment
|
Appointed through public application process or otherwise
|
Social Welfare Tribunal
|
Colin Walker
|
5 October 2012
|
5 October 2015
|
Appointed by the Tánaiste and Minister for Social Protection, by way of a recommendation from the Labour Court
|
|
Michael Carr
|
5 October 2012
|
Replaced by Mary Connaughton
|
Nominated by IBEC
|
|
Fergus Whelan
|
5 October 2012
|
5 October 2015
|
Nominated by ICTU
|
|
Chris Rowland
|
24 October 2011
|
5 October 2012
&
5 October 2015
|
Nominated by ICTU
|
|
Don O’Higgins
|
5 October 2012
|
5 October 2015
|
Nominated by IBEC
|
|
Mary Connaughton
|
5 October 2015
|
|
Nominated by IBEC
|
Board vacancies
There are currently 8 vacancies on the Citizens Information Board. There are none on the Boards of the Pensions Authority, the Pensions Council or the Social Welfare Tribunal.