asked the Minister for Finance the present membership of the Board of the Central Bank; the dates of their appointments; and the number of commercial bank directors on the Board.
Ceisteanna—Questions. Oral Answers. - Central Bank Board.
As required by section 5 of the Central Bank Act, 1942, there are three banking directors.
The remaining information requested by the Deputy is in the form of a tabular statement and, with your permission, a Cheann Comhairle, I propose to have it circulated with the Official Report.
Following is the statement:—
Board of the Central Bank of Ireland.
Name |
Date of Appointment |
Thomas K. Whitaker (Governor) |
19 December, 1958; appointed Governor 1 March, 1969. |
*Patrick Bourke |
1 February, 1955, reappointed 1 February, 1960, and 1 February, 1965. |
Juan Greene |
1 April, 1968. |
*John Leydon |
1 February, 1963; reappointed 1 February, 1968. |
James J. McElligott |
1 February, 1943; appointed Governor 1 April, 1953, and reappointed 1 April, 1960. |
Reappointed Director 1 January, 1961.Appointment as Director renewed 1 January, 1966. |
|
John P. Reihill |
1 May, 1960; reappointed 1 May, 1965. |
*John A. Ryan |
10 September, 1963; reappointed 1 February, 1967. |
W.J.L. Ryan |
Appointed 18 March, 1967. |
In addition, Mr. C. H. Murray has been appointed a director with effect from 1 April, 1969.
*Banking directors on the Board.