Jan O'Sullivan
Question:249 Ms O'Sullivan asked the Minister for Education and Science the length of time each present chair of institutes of technology has held office; and if he will make a statement on the matter. [6285/03]
Vol. 562 No. 4
249 Ms O'Sullivan asked the Minister for Education and Science the length of time each present chair of institutes of technology has held office; and if he will make a statement on the matter. [6285/03]
The details requested by the Deputy are shown on the list.
Appointment Details of Current Chairpersons of Governing Bodies of Institutes of Technology
Institute |
Current Chairperson |
Appointment Details |
Athlone |
Mr. Ciaran Temple |
Appointed 1/1/1993 for five yearsRe-appointed 1/1/1998 for five yearsRe-appointed 3/2/2003 |
Blanchardstown |
Mr. Donal Connell |
Appointed 10/12/1999 |
Carlow |
Mr. Edmund Burke |
Appointed 1/1/1993 for five yearsRe-appointed 1/1/1998 for five yearsRe-appointed 3/2/2003 |
Cork |
Mr. Donal O'Rourke |
Appointed 1/1/1993 for five yearsRe-appointed 1/1/1998 for five yearsRe-appointed 3/2/2003 |
Dundalk |
Mr. Clifford Kelly |
Appointed 1/1/1993 for five yearsRe-appointed 1/1/1998 for five yearsRe-appointed 3/2/2003 |
Galway-Mayo |
Mr. Michael O'hUiginn |
Appointed 1/1/1993 for five yearsRe-appointed 1/1/1998 for five yearsRe-appointed 3/2/2003 |
Letterkenny |
Mr. Michael McLoone |
Appointed 5/12/1996 for five yearsRe-appointed 5/12/2001 |
Limerick |
Mr. John Gallahue |
Appointed 3/2/2003 |
Sligo |
Mr. Joe Queenan |
Appointed 18/12/2002 |
Tallaght |
Mr. Thomas Clarke |
Appointed 1/1/1998 for five yearsRe-appointed 3/2/2003 |
Tralee |
Cllr. Flan Garvey |
Appointed 3/2/2003 |
Waterford |
Mr. Redmond O'Donoghue |
Appointed 3/2/2003 |
DIT |
Prof. Patrick Fottrell |
Appointed 5/9/2000 |