Following is the information requested by the Deputy.
The Personal Injuries Assessment Board
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Matthew Elderfield
|
05 February 2010 – 15 June, 2010
|
Nil
|
Bernard Sheridan
|
15 June 2010 – 01 October 2010
|
Nil
|
The Irish Auditing and Accounting Supervisory Authority
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
|
|
€
|
Karen Erwin, Chairperson
|
3 years
|
12,600
|
Tony Kelly
|
3 years
|
8,100
|
Senator Joe O’Toole
|
3 years
|
8,100
|
Michael Deasy
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Science Foundation Ireland
Appointments to the Board of Science Foundation Ireland are governed by statute under the Industrial Development (Science Foundation Ireland) Act 2003. The members of the Board are appointed by the Minister for Enterprise, Trade and Innovation, with the consent of the Minister for Finance following consultation with the Minister for Education and Skills.
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Dr Pat Duane
|
3 years
|
€2,169 to date/€8,100 pa
|
Martin Shanagher
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Shannon Free Airport Development Co. Ltd.
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
|
|
€
|
John Fitzgerald
|
6 years
|
12,600
|
Willie Loughnane
|
6 years
|
12,600
|
IDA Ireland
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
|
|
€
|
Liam O’Mahoney Chairman
|
5 years
|
21,600
|
Heather Ann Mc Sharry
|
5 years
|
12,600
|
Martin Shanagher
|
5 years
|
Nil
|
The Competition Authority
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Declan Purcell
|
27 April 2010 – 31 December 2010
|
Chairperson of Competition Authority per D/Finance sanction
|
Gerald Fitzgerald
|
6 Months
|
Member of Competition Authority per D/Finance sanction
|
Isolde Goggin
|
6 Months
|
Member of Competition Authority per D/Finance sanction
|
National Standards Authority of Ireland
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
|
|
€
|
Ann Riordan*
|
20/04/2010
|
12,600
|
Ed Stack*
|
20/04/2010
|
8,100
|
Damian Wallace
|
20/04/2010
|
8,100
|
James Collins
|
24/06/2010
|
8,100
|
*Ms Riordan was reappointed as Chairman and Mr Stack was reappointed to the Board.
No finite term is prescribed by the National Standards Authority of Ireland Act 1996, however, the three longest-serving members of the NSAI Board retire by rotation on 14 April each year, as referred to in Schedule 1 of the Act.
Forfás
The Board of Forfás is appointed under the Industrial Development Act 1993 (1st Schedule), as amended by the 2003 Act. The Board consists of 13 Members.
Each year, the two longest serving members of the Board must retire from office. A retiring member is eligible for reappointment.
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
|
|
€
|
Martin D. Shanahan
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
Simon Barry
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
Bob Brannock
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
Miriam Magner Flynn
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
Timothy Dullea
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
William O’Brien
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
Enterprise Ireland
The term of office served by each Board Member of Enterprise Ireland is determined by Section 9(8) of the Industrial Development (Enterprise Ireland) Act 1998: "On the anniversary of the establishment day and thereafter on each anniversary of the establishment day, two of the members of the Board (other than the chairperson and the chief executive officer) shall retire from office.
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Bob Savage
|
10 years
|
€12,600/€1,593.74 to date
|
Rita Shah
|
10 years
|
€12,600/€1,593.74 to date
|
The National Consumer Agency
Section 10 of the Consumer Protection Act 2007 provides that the members of the National Consumer Agency are appointed directly by the Minister (with the exception of the CEO, who is appointed by the Agency itself subject to the approval of the Minister). The section also provides that on the anniversary of the establishment day of the Agency and on each subsequent anniversary of that day, two members of the Agency (other than the chairperson and the chief executive) shall retire from office. The section further provides that a member of the Agency (other than the chief executive) shall serve for not more than 10 consecutive years.
The following were appointed members of the National Consumer Agency in 2010:
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
|
|
€
|
Fergus J. Gallagher
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
David Pierce
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
Ms Marie Dalton
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
Ms. Georgina Conroy
|
No fixed term
|
12,600
|
The Labour Court
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Kevin Duffy
|
3.5 years
|
Salary as sanctioned by Dept of Finance
|
Brendan Hayes
|
3 years
|
Salary as sanctioned by Dept of Finance
|
Mary Cryan
|
3 years
|
Salary as sanctioned by Dept of Finance
|
Jack Nash
|
10 months
|
Salary as sanctioned by Dept of Finance
|
Pádraigín Ní Mhurchú
|
3 years
|
Salary as sanctioned by Dept of Finance
|
John Doherty
|
4 months
|
Salary as sanctioned by Dept of Finance
|
Company Law Review Group
The Company Law Review Group (CLRG) was established under Part 7 of the Company Law Enforcement Act 2001. Section 69 of the Act states that the Review Group "shall consist of such and so many members that the Minister from time to time appoints". The CLRG is composed of 26 members who were appointed in July 2010 for a two-year term. The members represent company law practitioners (solicitors, barristers and accountants), IBEC, ICTU and other relevant representative bodies, regulating agencies and Government Departments.
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Tom Courtney (Chairman)
|
2 Years
|
€9,450
|
Paul Appleby
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Helen Dixon
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
William Johnston
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Vincent Madigan
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Tanya Holly
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Paul Egan
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Nora Rice
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Deirdre-Ann Barr
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Ian Drennan
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Jim Byrne
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Noel Rubotham
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Joseph Gavin
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Jonathan Buttimore
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Conall O’Halloran
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Mark Pery-Knox-Gore
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Ralph McDarby
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Mike Percival
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Mike Duignan
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Michael Halpenny
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Jon Rock
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Marie Daly
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Declan Murphy
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Mark Fielding
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Kathryn Maybury
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
Brian Kelliher
|
2 Years
|
Nil
|
The Companies Registration Office/Registry of Friendly Societies
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Helen DixonCompanies Registration OfficeRegistrar of Companies:
|
04/12/2009 — Term not prescribed
|
Remuneration is equivalent to the Principal Officer pay scale.
|
Registry of Friendly SocietiesRegistrar of Friendly Societies
|
2 years
|
|
Trade Mark Agents Board
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Liam Johnston
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Michael Kiernan
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Dermot Doyle
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Alex Schuster
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Patent Agents Board
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Imelda Hardiman
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Alex Schuster
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Peter Shortt
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Dolores Cassidy
|
3 years
|
Nil
|
Intellectual Property Policy Group
In June 2010 an Intellectual Property Implementation Group was established to drive the implementation of the IP related recommendations from the Innovation Taskforce Report in order to ensure that all enterprises, from small businesses to multinationals, get better access to Government-supported intellectual property and can then use it to create jobs and drive our economic recovery.
The Group will complete its work and complete its term of office in 2011. No payment has been made to members of the Group.
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Dr Jim Mountjoy (Chairman)
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Damien Callaghan
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
John Scanlan
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Richard Stokes
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Brendan Cremen
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Professor Terry Smith
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Dr Jeanne Bolger
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Barry Kennedy
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Dr Daniel O’Mahony
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Dr Ena Prosser
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Paul Kavanagh
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Karl Flannery
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
The Crafts Council of Ireland
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Patrick Hughes
|
3 years
|
€8,100
|
Innovation Taskforce Implementation Committee
A high level Committee was established on 10 May 2010 to implement the recommendations in the Report of the Innovation Task Force.
The members of the high-level implementation committee are:
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Batt O’Keeffe TD [Chairman]
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Lionel Alexander
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Aidan Brady
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Ned Costello
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Aidan Fitzsimons
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Chris Horn
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Brian Kelly
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Bryan Mohally
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Dr Cian Ó Mathúna
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Anna Scally
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Kevin Cardiff
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Seán Gorman
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Dermot McCarthy
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Brigid McManus
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Aidan Dunning
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
Martin Shanahan
|
No fixed term
|
Nil
|
The secretariat is provided by the Department of Enterprise, Trade and Innovation. Members of the Steering Group will not be remunerated for their work but may recoup travel and subsistence expenses incurred in accordance with public service guidelines.
Research Prioritisation High Level Steering Group
On 27 September a High Level Steering Group was established to oversee a project to establish priority areas of focus for Irish Research for the future. The purpose of this exercise is to identify up to twenty priority areas, or approaches to tackling national challenges that we face, and to concentrate future investment in publicly funded STI in those areas. The project will take account of research areas where Ireland has built significant strength to date and particularly areas that have the greatest potential to deliver sustainable economic return through enterprise development, employment creation, or indeed, quality of life.
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Jim O’Hara [Chairman]
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Professor Nicholas Canny
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Professor Frank Convery
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Marion Coy
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Professor Patrick Cunningham
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Seán Dorgan
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Dr Alistair Glass
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Brian J Hayes
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Professor Brian MacCraith
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Kevin McCarthy
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Dr Tom McCarthy
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Martin Naughton
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Ian Quinn
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Maurice Roche
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Professor Frances Ruane
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Martin Shanagher
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
Martin Shanahan
|
1 year
|
Nil
|
The secretariat is provided by Forfás. The Steering Group has been asked to submit its report to Government by September 2011. The members of the Group will not be remunerated for their work but may recoup travel and subsistence expenses incurred in accordance with public service guidelines
The Office of the Director of Corporate Enforcement
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Paul Appleby
|
5 Years
|
Remuneration is equivalent to the Assistant Secretary pay scale
|
The Rights Commissioner Service
Member
|
Term of Office
|
Remuneration per annum
|
Mark A McGrath
|
3 years
|
Per diem of €434.32
|
Michael Hayes
|
3 years
|
Per diem of €434.32
|
Joan Carmichael
|
3 years
|
Per diem of €434.32
|
John Walsh
|
3 years
|
Per diem of €434.32
|
Eugene Hanly
|
3 years
|
Per diem of €434.32
|
Rosaleen Glackin
|
3 years
|
Per diem of €434.32
|
Jim O’Connell
|
3 years
|
Per diem of €434.32
|
Sean Reilly
|
3 years
|
Per diem of €434.32
|
Appointments made by Minister Calleary to the Employment Appeals Tribunal from 30 January 2010
Appointments to the panel of Vice-Chairmen
|
3 year term
|
Sinéad Behan
|
Graham Hanlon
|
Roderick Maguire
|
Kieran Buckley
|
Eamon Harrington
|
Seán Mahon
|
Ann Marie Courell
|
David Herlihy
|
Jeananne McGovern
|
Fíona Crawford
|
Elva Kearney
|
Saundra McNally
|
Dorothy Donovan
|
Margaret Levey
|
Mark O’Connell
|
Catherine Egan
|
James M. Lucey
|
Moya Quinlan
|
Veronica Gates
|
Dermot MacCarthy
|
Nicholas Russell
|
Bernadette Glynn
|
Orna Madden
|
Jeremiah Sheedy
|
5 year term
|
Pamela Clancy
|
Dara Hayes
|
Jeremiah O’Connor
|
Charles Corcoran
|
Patrick Hurley
|
Patricia O’Connor
|
Emile Daly
|
Mary McAveety
|
Peter J. O’Leary
|
John F. Fahy
|
Penelope McGrath
|
Joe Revington
|
James Flanagan
|
Eamon Murray
|
Thomas Ryan
|
Myles Gilvarry
|
Niamh O’Carroll Kelly
|
Tony Taaffe
|
Clodagh Gleeson
|
Leachlain S. Ó Catháin
|
|
Appointments to the panel of employee representatives on the basis of nominations from the Irish Congress of Trade Unions
3 year term
|
Frank Barry
|
John Flannery
|
Patrick King
|
Thomas Brady
|
Tom J. Gill
|
Sean Mackell
|
Eveta Brezina
|
Helen Henry
|
Máire Mulcahy
|
Alexander Butler
|
Thomas A. Hogan
|
Helen Murphy
|
J. Finbarr Dorgan
|
Suzanne Kelly
|
Séamus O’Donnell
|
Patsy Doyle
|
Mary Finnerty
|
Tony Kelly
|
Frank Keoghan
|
Ciaran Ryan
|
David Thomas
|
5 year term
|
James Dorney
|
Joe Maher
|
Owen Nulty
|
Noel Dowling
|
Mary Maher
|
Michael O’Reilly
|
John Flavin
|
Dominic McEvoy
|
Patrick Trehy
|
Noirin Greene
|
Michael McGarry
|
Gerard Whyte
|
Jim Jordan
|
Alice Moore
|
Owen Wills
|
Hilary Kelleher
|
Jim Moore
|
Paddy Woods
|
Rosabel Kerrigan
|
Phil Ní Sheaghdha
|
|
Appointments to the panel of employer representatives on the basis of nominations from Employers' Representative Bodies
3 year term
|
Gerard Andrews
|
James Hennessy
|
Tom O’Grady
|
Pat Casey
|
Ben Kealy
|
James O’Neill
|
John G. Flanagan
|
Finbar Moloney
|
Patrick Pierce
|
Moss Flood
|
Desmond Morrison
|
Robert D. E. Prole
|
Angela Gaule
|
Michael J. Murphy
|
John Reid
|
James Goulding
|
Michael Noone
|
Declan F. Winston
|
Eamon C. Handley
|
William O’Carroll
|
|
5 year term
|
Joe Browne
|
Con Lucey
|
Tadg O’Sullivan
|
Michael Carr
|
Gerry McAuliffe
|
Dermot Peakin
|
Frank Cunneen
|
Cyril McHugh
|
Peter J. Pierson
|
Thomas L. Gill
|
Don Moore
|
William Power
|
Don Hegarty
|
Roger F. Murphy
|
Máire Sweeney
|
John Horan
|
J.J. Killian
|
Aidan O’Mara
|
Neil Ormond
|
Liam Tobin
|
Jean Winters
|
The rates of remuneration per diem for the EAT are as follows:
Position
|
Nature of Remuneration
|
Amount of Remuneration Per diem
|
|
|
€
|
Chairperson
|
Sitting
|
591.10
|
|
Conference
|
140.76
|
Vice Chairperson
|
Sitting
|
381.34
|
|
Conference
|
113.11
|
Member
|
Sitting
|
193.24
|
|
Conference
|
97.57
|