Bernard Allen
Ceist:225 Mr. Allen asked the Minister for Defence the appointments made by him to boards, agencies or committees operating under the aegis of his Department from 17 April 2002 to date [17191/02]
Vol. 554 No. 5
225 Mr. Allen asked the Minister for Defence the appointments made by him to boards, agencies or committees operating under the aegis of his Department from 17 April 2002 to date [17191/02]
I have, as Minister for Defence, made the following appointments since 17 April 2002:
Civil Defence Board
Dr. Michael Ryan (Chairperson);
Col. Michael Cleary;
Chief Superintendent Denis Fitzpatrick;
Mr. Paddy Durack;
Mr. Declan Burns;
Mr. Ned Gleeson;
Mr. Gerry Gervin;
Mr. Sean Hogan;
Dr. Ann McGarry;
Mr. Michael Fitzsimons;
Ms Frances Moynihan;
Cllr. Tony Kelly;
Cllr. Margaret Adams;
Ms Irene O'Meara
Coiste an AsgardMr. Gerard O'Donnell;
Mr. Sean Flood;
Dr. Roy Brown;
Mr. Michael Murphy;
Ms Joannes Berkery;
Ms Kalanne O'Leary;
Mr. Patrick O'Hara.
In addition, I appointed Mr. Patrick Pierce as chair of the equality steering group which has been set up on foot of recommendations contained in the report of the external advisory group on the Defence Forces in relation to bullying, harassment, sexual harassment and discrimination in the Defences Forces, the Doyle report.
226 Mr. Allen asked the Minister for Defence the solicitors or barristers who were appointed since July 1997 as members or chairpersons of any board or committee or other body, advisers, consultants, or as holders of any other position or office other than judicial office under the aegis of or in his Department; the name of the person in each case; if these persons are solicitors or barristers; the position to which these persons were appointed; the date of appointment; the date these persons ceased to hold the position if applicable; the remuneration paid since July 1997; and if the holding of particular legal qualifications or experience was a requirement for the position in question. [17248/02]
The information sought by the Deputy is as follows:
Name |
Appointment |
Date of Appointment |
Mr. David Byrne, Senior Counsel |
Member of the Board of Directors – Coiste An Asgard |
25/03/1999 to 08/11/2000 |
Ms Kalanne O'Leary, Solicitor |
Member of the Board of Directors – Coiste An Asgard |
24/09/2002 |
Mr. David Andrews, Senior Counsel |
Member and Chairman – Central Council of the Irish Red Cross Society |
14/04/2000 |
Mr. Sean Costello, Solicitor |
Member – Central Council of the Irish Red Cross Society |
19/07/2000 |
Mr. Rory McCabe, Senior Counsel |
Member – Central Council of the Irish Red Cross Society |
19/07/2000 |
Ms Niamh Stewart, Barrister at Law |
Adjudicator under the Defence Forces Conciliation and Arbitration Scheme |
26/02/2002 |
Ms Oonah McCrann, Barrister at Law |
Judge Advocate General |
24/09/2001 |