It is proposed to take Questions Nos. 181 and 183 together.
Since my appointment as Minister for Social Protection I have appointed one special advisor, Mr. Edward Brophy, and one press advisor, Ms Kathleen Barrington.
Details of the advisers appointed by my predecessors in the past five years are shown in the following table.
Minister
|
Period in office
|
Special Adviser
|
Press Adviser
|
Martin Cullen
|
14/06/2007-07/05/2008
|
None
|
Michelle Hoctor
|
Mary Hanafin
|
08/05/2008-23/03/2010
|
Averil Power
|
Geraldine Butler
|
Eamon Ó’ Cuiv
|
24/03/2010-08/03/2011
|
Padraic Ó’ hUiginn
|
Michelle Hoctor
|