In response to the Deputy's question, I have detailed below the information requested in respect of Special Advisers and Press Advisers employed in my Department for the past five years.
Name
|
Title
|
Dermot Murphy from 29/10/2004-06/05/2008
|
Special Adviser to Minister Mary Coughlan
|
Michael Shovlinfrom 02/05/2006-07/09/2007
|
Press Adviser toMinister Mary Coughlan
|
Sean Perry from 23/01/2008-06/05/2008
|
Press Adviser to Minister Mary Coughlan
|
Stiofan Nuttyfrom 01/11/2007-11/02/2010
|
Special Adviser to Minister of State Trevor Sargent
|
Dermot M Ryan from 07/05/2008-31/12/2010
|
Special Adviser to Minister Brendan Smith
|
Philip Hannon from 07/05/2008-09/03/2011
|
Special Adviser to Minister Brendan Smith
|