I propose to take Questions Nos. 603 to 605, inclusive, together.
Since May 2011, a notification has been placed on my Department’s website inviting expressions of interest from persons interested in being appointed to the boards of State Bodies under the aegis of my Department. On 7 September 2012 last, I placed an advertisement in the National Newspapers inviting expressions of interest. All expressions of interest lapse at the end of the calendar year.
In making any board appointments, I am not necessarily confined to those who make such expressions of interest but ensure that all of those appointed have the relevant mix of knowledge and expertise to contribute to the relevant board.
In the case of a number of bodies, some board appointments, while made by me, are not at my sole discretion and, instead, individuals are nominated for appointment by me by various organisations as specified in the relevant statute. These are the Aquaculture Licensing Appeals Board, Bord Bia, Teagasc, National Milk Agency, Veterinary Council of Ireland and Horse Racing Ireland.
The information sought by the Deputy is outlined in the table below as at 19 February 2013:
Body/Agency
|
No of Board Members
|
No of Board appointments since March 2011
|
Name
|
Date Appointed
|
Qualifications
|
‘Expression of Interest’ appointments
|
Aquaculture Licensing Appeals Board
|
7
|
4
|
Brendan Brice
Camilla Keane
Sean Murphy
Michael Sweeney
|
9 November 2011
23 February 2012
1 January 2013
1 January 2013
|
Chartered Civil Engineer
Natural Environment Researcher and Caseworker Officer
CEO NUTRECO(Ireland)-Fishfeed for Fish Farming.
Operations Manager-Odlum Group
Agricultural Consultant in rural and alternative industrial development
|
None-nominations made by prescribed organisations from which Minister made appointments
|
|
|
|
Michael Carey (Chair)
|
19 November 2011
|
|
|
An Bord Bia
|
15
|
10
( including the Chair)
|
Gary Brown
Michael Cronin
Rhona Holland
John Kingston
Brody Sweeney
John Comer
Mary J Byrne
John Bryan
John Horgan
|
7 October 2011
7 October 2011
7 October 2011
7 October 2011
7 October 2011
7 February 2012
28 March 2012
24 March 2012
7 December 2012
|
EX Chairman Jacob’s Fruitfield
CEO Below the Line Marketing
Dairy Sector
Marketing Director Global Intelligence
Dairy /Beef Farmer
Consumer Foods
President ICMSA
Principal Officer, Department of Agriculture, Food & the Marine
President IFA
Chief Executive Kepak
|
None-nominations made by prescribed organisations from which Minister made appointments
|
Bord Iascaigh Mhara
|
6
|
1
|
Kieran Calnan (Chair)
|
13 June 2012
|
Currently President of SWS Ltd and was previously Senior Manager and CEO with same company
|
None
|
|
|
|
Philip Meaney (Chair)
|
12 April 2011
|
|
|
Bord na gCon
|
7
|
6
( including the Chair)
|
Matt Murphy
Brendan Moore
Tim Gilbert
Tony McNamee
William O’Dwyer
|
2 December 2011
2 December 2011
2 December 2011
2 December 2011
12 June 2012
|
Appointments made at Minister’s discretion from persons with an interest in grey hound racing.
|
None
|
|
|
|
Brendan McKenna (Chair)
|
8 October 2012
|
|
|
Coillte
|
9
|
3
( including the Chair)
|
Oliver McCabe
David Gunning
|
24 October 2011
- Resigned from board with effect from 1 November 2012
25 May 2012
|
Formerly Chief Executive of Abbott Ireland Manufacturing Operations and is a past President of the Chambers of Commerce Ireland. He has previously served as Chairman of Coillte from 26 June 2002 to 25 June 2007 and from 9 October 2007 to 8 October 2012.
Appointed as a worker representative
Chief Executive of Coillte since July 2006 and has previously served as a Director on the Board from 25 July 2006 until 24 July 2011.
|
None
|
Horse Racing Ireland
|
14
|
3
|
Noel Meade
Neville O’Byrne
Mary O’Connor
|
8 February 2012
8 February 2012
8 February 2012
|
All nominations from the Horse Racing industry
|
None
|
Irish National Stud
|
7
|
0
|
-
|
-
|
-
|
-
|
Marine Institute
|
9
|
2
|
Paul Hyde
David Owen
|
1 June 2012
4 December 2012
|
Architect
Chartered Accountant
|
Both appointments were from ‘expressions of interest’
|
National Milk Agency
|
14 including Chair
|
6
|
Elected Members
Denis Fagan
Eamonn McEnteggart
Padraig Mulligan
Timothy Cashman
Jerome Crowley
Nominated Members
Eoghan Sweeney
|
23 January 2012
23 January 2012
23 January 2012
23 January 2012
23 January 2012
23 January 2012
|
Producer representatives are elected to the board of the National Milk Agency. Other members are nominated by various interest bodies.
|
None
|
Sea Fisheries Protection Authority
|
3
|
1
|
Dr Susan Steele
|
With effect from
4 March 2013
|
Zoology graduate
|
Yes
|
Teagasc
|
11
|
4
|
Thomas Cooke
Dr Karina Pierce
Brendan Gleeson
Tom Tynan
|
5 October 2011
9 January 2013
9 January 2013
9 January 2013
|
Farmer and ICMSA representative
Lecturer in Dairy Production in UCD’s School of Agriculture
Principal Officer in the Department of Agriculture, Food and the Marine
Senior Manager in Origin Enterprises, Aryzta AG, (formerly IAWS Group plc) and Golden Vale plc
|
3 of the appointments were from ‘expressions of interest’
|
Veterinary Council
|
19
|
6
|
Michael Sheahan
Peadar Ó’Scanaill
Michael Sadlier
Deirdre Campion
Martin Blake
Crionna Creagh
|
1 January 2012
1 January 2012
1 January 2012
1 January 2012
21 December 2011
27 August 2012
|
All must be registered veterinary practitioners and elected by the membership
Chief Veterinary Officer of the Department of Agriculture, Food and the Marine
LLB (Hons); MA Medical Law & Ethics appointed by the Minister in accordance with Section 16(1) and Section 17(2) of the Veterinary Practice Act 2005 after the National Consumer Agency did not furnish a nomination.
|
None
|
No appointments to the following State Bodies have been made since March 2011:
- Irish National Stud
- National Milk Agency – members elected rather than appointed
Directors of State Bodies who are officials of the Department of Agriculture, Food and the Marine do not receive board fees.
Book Makers Appeal Committee
|
5
|
1
(Chair)
|
Peter Allen
|
17 November 2011
|
Solicitor
|
None
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Book Makers Appeal Committee Chair shall be a judge or a practising barrister or solicitor of at least 7 years standing.
19 February 2013