In answer to the Deputy's question please find herewith those details regarding the names of persons nominated to serve in positions carrying remuneration, other than out of pocket expenses, on commissions, industrial, assurance, semi-State or other similar concerns; the amounts received annually in respect of each appointment; the name of the concern to which the appointment was made during the years 2011 to date. The figures provided in the table below in relation to remuneration run to the end of 2015.
Body
|
Nominee
|
Appointed (yes/no and date, if any)
|
Remuneration 2011
|
Remuneration 2012
|
Remuneration 2013
|
Remuneration 2014
|
Remuneration 2015
|
Central Bank Commission
|
Blanaid Clarke (appointed by previous minister)
|
Reappointed 1/10/2013
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
0 - note 1
|
0 - note 3
|
|
Patricia Byron
|
1/1/2014
|
-
|
-
|
-
|
0 - note 1
|
€11,202 - note 2
|
|
Des Geraghty (appointed by previous minister)
|
Reappointed 1/10/2014
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
|
Michael Soden (Appointed by previous minister)
|
Reappointed1/10/2014
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
|
Alan Ahearne (appointed by previous minister)
|
Reappointed 7/3/2015
|
€12,236 (note 3a)
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
0 - note 1
|
0 - due to one person, one salary principle
|
|
John FitzGerald (Appointed by previous minister)
|
Reappointed 1/10/2015
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
€2,489 - notes 1,2
|
Annual rate €14,936
|
|
Philip Lane (appointed as member 21/10/2015 until 26/11/2015)
|
-
|
-
|
-
|
-
|
-
|
0 - note 3
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Credit Union Advisory Committee
|
Donal McKillop (chair)Denise O'ConnellJoe O'Toole
|
All appointed 22/9/2014 for three-year term
|
Nil
|
Nil
|
Nil
|
Chair €3705 per annum2 ordinary members €2470 per annum each
|
Chair €3705 per annum2 ordinary members €2470 per annum each
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Credit Union Restructuring Board
|
Bobby McVeigh (chair)
|
All appointed 31/8/2012
|
Nil
|
Chairman €11,970 per annum10 ordinary members €7,695 per annum each
|
Chairman €11,970 per annum10 ordinary members €7,695 per annum each
|
Chairman €11,970 per annum10 ordinary members €7,695 per annum each
|
Chairman €11,970 per annum9 ordinary members €7,695 per annum each
|
|
Eoin McGettigan
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Tom Kavanagh
|
Tom Kavanagh resigned 30/6/2014. Not replaced
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Brendan Burke
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Kathleen Prendergast
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Stephen O'Donovan
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Joe O'Toole
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Pat Fay - ILCU
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Jimmy Johnstone - ILCU
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Tim Molan - CUMA
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Kevin Johnson - CUDA
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Neil Ryan - Dept of Finance rep, no fee
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Elaine Byrne - Central Bank rep, no fee
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Disabled Drivers Medical Board of Appeal +++
|
Dr Angela McNamara++
|
22/3/1994 (most recent reappointment 7/11/2015)
|
€4857.60
|
€4250.40
|
€7893.40
|
€12,140.00
|
€7893.60
|
|
Dr Cara McDonagh (chair)+
|
22/1//2012
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
|
Dr Jimmy Leitch++
|
8/3/2006 (most recent reappointment 29/7/2014)
|
€9,108
|
€9,715.20
|
€14,572.80
|
?Ç12,751,20
|
€7,893.60
|
|
Dr Nicky Scaramuzzi++
|
25/6/2014
|
-
|
-
|
-
|
-
|
€8,500.80
|
|
Dr John O'Keeffe++
|
25/7/2005 (most recent reappointment 29/7/2014)
|
€8500.80
|
€7,893.60
|
€14,572.80
|
€14,572.80
|
€8,500.80
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Financial Services Ombudsman Bureau
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Financial Services Ombudsman Council ***
|
Dermott Jewell (chair)
|
Reappointed 29/10/2013*
Reappointed 29/10/2015**
|
€21,600 annual fee
|
€21,600 annual fee
|
€21,600 annual fee
|
€21,600 annual fee
|
€21,600 annual fee
|
|
Paddy Leydon (member)
|
Reappointed 29/10/2013*
Reappointed 29/10/2015**
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
|
Frank Wynn (member)
|
Reappointed 29/10/2013*
Reappointed 29/10/2015**
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
|
Caitriona Ni Charra (member)
|
Reappointed 29/10/2013*
Reappointed 29/10/2015**
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
|
Tony Kerr (member)
|
Reappointed 29/10/2013*
Reappointed 29/10/2015**
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
|
Michael Connolly (member)
|
Reappointed 29/10/2013*
Reappointed 29/10/2015**
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
|
Elizabeth Walsh (member)
|
Appointed 29/10/2013*
Reappointed 29/10/2015**
|
|
|
€3150 (three months' fees)
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
€12,600 annual fee
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Investor Compensation Company Ltd
|
Mark Redmond
|
Reappointed with effect from 1/8/2011 to 31/7/2014 Reappointed with effect from 1/8/2014 to 31/7/2015
|
The annual fee payable in each case is €8550
|
|
|
|
|
|
Gina Quin
|
Reappointed with effect from 1/8/2011 to 31/7/2014 Reappointed with effect from 1/8/2014 to 31/7/2015
|
The annual fee payable in each case is €8550
|
|
|
|
|
|
Inge Clissman SC
|
Reappointed with effect from 1/8/2011 to 31/7/2014 Reappointed with effect from 1/8/2014 to 31/7/2015
|
The annual fee payable in each case is €8550
|
|
|
|
|
|
Enda Newton
|
Appointed with effect from 19/10/2015 (2-year term to 31/7/2017)
|
The annual fee payable in each case is €8550
|
|
|
|
|
|
Siobhán Madden
|
Appointed with effect from 19/10/2015 (3-year term to 31/7/2018)
|
The annual fee payable in each case is €8550
|
|
|
|
|
|
Valerie Bowens
|
Appointed with effect from 19/10/2015 (3-year term to 31/7/2018)
|
The annual fee payable in each case is €8550
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Irish Bank Resolution Company
|
not applicable (in special liquidation)
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Irish Fiscal Advisory Council (note 4)
|
Professor John McHale (Chair)
|
Appointed Dec 2012
|
Annual fees (note 5) Chair €20,520 Council members €11,970
|
|
|
|
|
|
Sebastian Barnes
|
Appointed Dec 2012
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Dr Donal Donovan
|
Appointed Dec 2012. Term ended Dec 2014
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Dr Alan Barrett
|
Appointed Dec 2012. Resigned May 2015
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Dr Róisín O'Sullivan
|
Appointed Dec 2012. Term ended Dec 2015
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Dr Íde Kearney
|
Appointed March 2015
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Michael G Tutty
|
Appointed Sept 2015 followed by a second term effective from Jan 2016
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Seamus Coffey
|
Appointed Jan 2016
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
National Asset Management Agency
|
Frank Daly (chair)
|
22/12/14 (reappointed)
|
€153,778
|
€150,000
|
€150,000
|
€150,000
|
€150,000
|
|
Brian McEnery (board member)
|
22/12/13 (reappointed)
|
€60,000
|
€60,000
|
€60,000
|
€60,000
|
€60,000
|
|
William Soffe (board member)
|
22/12/13 (reappointed)
|
€75,000
|
€75,000
|
€75,000
|
€75,000
|
€75,000
|
|
Oliver Ellingham (board member)
|
10/04/2013
|
-
|
-
|
€41,750
|
€60,000
|
€60,000
|
|
Mari Hurley (board member)
|
08/04/2014
|
-
|
-
|
|
€43,033
|
€60,000
|
|
John Mulcahy Executive Board Member
|
07/03/2012 (retired Jan 2014)
|
-
|
-
|
|
|
|
|
Jim Kelly Audit Committee External Member
|
Re-appointed 3/12/2013
|
€9,694
|
€10,000
|
€10,000
|
€10,000
|
€10,000
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
National Treasury Management Agency (Board) Since 22 Dec 2014
|
Willie Walsh (Chair) (i)
|
Appointed Dec 2014
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
0
|
0
|
|
Maeve Carton
|
Appointed Dec 2014
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€815
|
€30,000
|
|
Brendan McDonagh
|
Appointed Dec 2014
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€815
|
€30,000
|
|
Martin Murphy
|
Appointed Dec 2014
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€815
|
€30,000
|
|
Mary Walsh
|
Appointed Dec 2014
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€815
|
€30,000
|
|
Susan Webb
|
Appointed Dec 2014
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€815
|
€30,000
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
NTMA Advisory Committee (dissolved 22 Dec 2014)
|
Willie Walsh Chair as of June 2014
|
Nov 2013
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
0
|
0
|
n/a
|
|
Donald C Roth (reappointed)
|
Jan 2014
|
€25,000
|
€22,500
|
€22,500
|
€21,889
|
n/a
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
NPRF - consists of one member since 22 Dec 2014
|
Maurice A Keane (reappointed)
|
Feb 2012
|
n/a
|
€34,283
|
€34,283
|
€33,289
|
n/a
|
|
Dr Frances Ruane (ii) (reappointed)
|
July 2014
|
€34,283
|
€34,283
|
€34,283
|
€33,289
|
n/a
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
NDFA Board - Dissolved 23 Jan 2015
|
Gerry Murray (iii)
|
July 2012
|
n/a
|
0
|
0
|
0
|
0
|
|
Petrina Smyth
|
July 2012
|
n/a
|
€5,736
|
€12,600
|
€12,600
|
€859
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
State Claims Agency Policy Committee - Dissolved 22 Dec 2015
|
Noel Whelan (chair) reappointed
|
July 2012
|
€13,713
|
€10,918
|
€13,713
|
€13,317
|
n/a
|
|
Wendy Thompson (iv)
|
June 2012
|
n/a
|
0
|
0
|
0
|
n/a
|
|
Fachtna Murphy
|
June 2012
|
n/a
|
€4571
|
€9142
|
€8877
|
n/a
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Strategic Banking Corporation of Ireland Board
|
Tom McAleese
|
March 2015
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€12,170
|
|
Barbara Cotter
|
March 2015
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€12,409
|
|
AJ Noonan
|
March 2015
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€12,409
|
|
Eilis Quinlan
|
March 2015
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€12,409
|
|
Richard Pelly
|
March 2015
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€12,409
|
|
Rosheen McGuckian
|
March 2015
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
n/a
|
€11,991
|
Note 1: Due to application of one-person-one-salary principle from 2014
Note 2: OPOS applied for part of the year
Note 3: due to one-person-one-salary principle
Note 3a: Appointed part-way through the year
Note 4: The initial 5 members of the Fiscal Council, including the Chairperson, were appointed on an administrative basis when the Council was established on a non-statutory basis in July 2011. These 5 members were re-appointed in December 2012 when the Council was put on a statutory footing.
Note 5: Where members, including the Chair, are employed by a body within the Irish public sector, no fee is payable to the member concerned; a time buy-out is in place to compensate the full-time public sector employers of Council members, including the Chair, for costs incurred due to their absence on IFAC business.
*: In view of the short term of the Council and the amalgamation of the Offices of the Pension Ombudsman and the Financial Services Ombudsman which required the experience of the existing Council to effect, these positions were not advertised. The appointment of an additional person with specific legal qualifications and experience was also required in 2013.
** The current Council was reappointed with effect from 29th October 2015 to 28th October 2016 (one year only) or the date of the amalgamation of the Offices of the Financial Services Ombudsman and the Pensions Ombudsman, whichever is the sooner.
*** The Minister is in the process of appointing new members to the Financial Services Ombudsman Council. This process was organised by the Public Appointments Service and publicly advertised. It is not considered appropriate to name individuals who may be appointed as the process is not concluded.
+ The Chairperson of the Board is a Consultant in Rehabilitation Medicine and part of her salary is in respect of her role as chairperson of the Board. Her salary is paid by the National Rehabilitation Hospital and reimbursed by the Department of Finance
++ Ordinary Members of the Medical Board of Appeal are paid a Sessional fee of €607.20 per clinic
+++ Members of the Medical Board of Appeal are nominated by the Minister for Health and appointed by the Minister for Finance
(i) Willie Walsh waived remuneration/fees in respect of his position
(ii) Dr Frances Ruane was employed by the ESRI and did not receive any fees in respect of her role as a Commissioner. These fees were paid directly to the ESRI
(iii) Gerry Murray waived his fee as a Board member
(iv) Wendy Thompson waived her fee as a Board member
The tables for the NTMA Agency (Board), the NTMA advisory Committee, the NPRF Commission, the NDFA Board, the State Claims Agency Policy Committee and the SBCI Board reflect the following:
- Persons who served in positions which carried remuneration whether paid to them or to their employer.
- Persons due remuneration who waived it.
- It does not include any persons who served in positions that do not carry remuneration in respect of their membership e.g. ex officio members and/ or appointees from the civil service.