Details of the politically appointed staff employed by my Department and acting in an advisory capacity are as follows:
Name
|
Role
|
Commencement Date
|
Cessation Date
|
Brian Murphy
|
Chief of Staff
|
14 June 2017
|
n/a
|
John Carroll
|
Head of Policy and Programme Implementation
|
05 July 2017
|
n/a
|
Patrick Geoghegan
|
Special Adviser to the Taoiseach
|
14 June 2017
|
n/a
|
Angela Flanagan
|
Special Adviser to the Taoiseach
|
14 June 2017
|
n/a
|
Philip O'Callaghan
|
Special Adviser to the Taoiseach
|
14 June 2017
|
n/a
|
Clare Mungovan
|
Special Adviser to the Taoiseach
|
08 Jan 2018
|
n/a
|
Jim D'Arcy
|
Special Adviser to the Taoiseach
|
04 Sept 2017
|
n/a
|
Nick Miller
|
Spokesman and Communications Adviser to the Taoiseach
|
14 June 2017
|
31 Oct 2017
|
Feargal Purcell
|
Government Press Secretary
|
14 June 2017
|
31 Oct 2017
|
Nick Miller
|
Government Press Secretary
|
01 Nov 2017
|
n/a
|
Sarah Meade
|
Assistant Government Press Secretary
|
31 July 2017
|
n/a
|
Catherine Halloran
|
Deputy Government Press Secretary
|
14 June 2017
|
n/a
|
Name
|
Role
|
Commencement Date
|
Cessation Date
|
Mark O'Doherty
|
Special Adviser to the Government Chief Whip
|
14 June 2017
|
n/a
|
Greg Harkin
|
Special Adviser to the Government Chief Whip
|
14 June 2017
|
15 Feb 2018
|
Ed Carty
|
Special Adviser to the Government Chief Whip
|
12 March 2018
|
n/a
|
Name
|
Role
|
Commencement Date
|
Cessation Date
|
Tony Williams
|
Chief Strategist for the Independent Alliance
|
14 June 2017
|
n/a
|
Dónall Geoghegan
|
Political Coordinator for Independent Ministers
|
14 June 2017
|
n/a
|
Special Advisers working with Minister of State Helen McEntee and Minister of State Paul Kehoe are employed by the Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade and Department of Defence respectively.