I have appointed three advisers to date. Minister of State Seán Canney has appointed one adviser. Details are summarised in Table A.
Table A:
Name
|
Title
|
Minister
|
Department
|
Commencement Date
|
Cessation Date
|
Mr Padraig Hughes
|
Special Adviser
|
Minister Michael Ring
|
Department of Rural & Community Development
|
11/06/2018
|
Still in employment
|
Mr Daniel Rowan
|
Press Adviser
|
Minister Michael Ring
|
Department of Rural & Community Development
|
14/08/2017
|
Still in employment
|
Mr Seamus Ó Ceallacháin
|
Special Adviser
|
Minister Michael Ring
|
Department of Rural and Community Development
|
11/09/2017
|
31/5/2018
|
Mr Robert Hughes
|
Special Adviser
|
Minister of State Seán Canney
|
Department of Communications, Climate Action & Environment and the Department of Rural & Community Development
|
2/01/2019
|
Still in employment
|
In addition to the above I also avail of further advisory support from Mr Paul Mc Grath, who provides me with support and advice in an unpaid capacity from 2017 to date.